Correos v. Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harold S Correos
Defendant: Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc., Nevada Legal News, Home Means Nevada Inc, Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz, Matthew Dayton, Michael W. Chen, Ramir M Hernandez, Eddie R Jimenez, Alliance Bancorp, Impact Funding Corp., Deutsche Bank NTC, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage and altisource
Case Number: 2:2023cv00593
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cristina D Silva
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Filing 24 JUDGMENT in favor of Alliance Bancorp, Deutsche Bank NTC, Home Means Nevada Inc, Impact Funding Corp., Nevada Legal News, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage, Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc., altisource, Eddie R Jimenez, Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz, Matthew Dayton, Michael W. Chen, Ramir M Hernandez against Harold S Correos. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 6/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Deutsche Bank NTC, Ramir M Hernandez, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage, Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 JOINDER to #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant altisource. (Hernandez, Ramir)
May 25, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Harold S Correos. Replies due by 6/1/2023. (JQC)
May 23, 2023 Filing 19 JOINDER to #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Michael W. Chen, Matthew Dayton, Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz. (Schuler-Hintz, Kristin)
May 22, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by altisource that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.a.r.l. for altisource added.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
May 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant altisource. (Hernandez, Ramir)
May 16, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/16/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #14 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 15, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants Deutsche Bank NTC, Ramir M Hernandez, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage, Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hernandez, Ramir)
May 12, 2023 Filing 15 Amended-added Altisource/Objection to Clark County by Harold S Correos. (LOE)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #10 Correos' Objection is OVERRULED and Magistrate Judge Youchah's 4/27/2023, #5 Order is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 4, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.. (JQC)
May 4, 2023 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Harold S Correos. (JQC)
May 4, 2023 Filing 10 OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re #5 Order by Plaintiff Harold S Correos. Responses due by 5/18/2023. (JQC)
May 4, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deutsche Bank NTC, Ramir M Hernandez, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage, Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.a.r.l. for Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent PHH Corporation for PHH Mortgage; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A. for Deutsche Bank NTC added.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
May 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendants Deutsche Bank NTC, Ramir M Hernandez, Ocwen, PHH Mortgage, Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Harold S Correos. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/8/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
April 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Harold S Correos. (LOE)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions to Vacate Auction Sell and Motion for Order for Permanent Dismissal with Prejudice #3 and #4 are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Order for Permanent Dismissal by Plaintiff Harold S Correos. Responses due by 5/8/2023. (LOE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Auction sell by Plaintiff Harold S Correos. Responses due by 5/8/2023. (LOE)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER and Consent for Electronic Service of Documents to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents) (KF)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 - PAID) by Harold S Correos. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/28/2023. Proof of service due by 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt #200003609) (KF)
April 18, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ALZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correos v. Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold S Correos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive - Nevada - Inc.
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Legal News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Means Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dayton
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Chen
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramir M Hernandez
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie R Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Funding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank NTC
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: altisource
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?