Winkler v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Geoff Winkler, J&J Consulting Services, Inc. and J and J Purchasing LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00703
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Filing 47 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re #43 Stipulation for Stay to Mediate held on 8/15/2023 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Crtrm Administrator: A. Caytuero; Pla Counsel: Daniel C. Girard, Esq., Jason Kellogg, Esq., & Jarrod L. Rickard, Esq.; Def Counsel: K. Issac deVyver, Esq., Joseph G. Went, Esq., & Molly M. White, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 9:07 AM - 9:12 AM; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ CRD; Recording start and end times: 9:07:37 - 9:12:20; Courtroom: 3C; Plaintiff Geoff Winkler is present with counsel. Defendant's counsel is also present. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears the representations of counsel as to #43 Stipulation for Stay to Mediate. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that #43 Stipulation for Stay to Mediate is GRANTED. Discovery in this case will be stayed until Tuesday, November 7, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file either a status report or request to extend the stay no later than Tuesday, October 31, 2023, as stated on the record. If this case does not settle and a request to extend the stay is not filed, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order must be filed no later than Tuesday, November 14, 2023. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 14, 2023 Filing 46 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler.. (Rickard, Jarrod)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re: #43 Stipulation to stay discovery : The Court hereby SETS a hearing on the stipulation for 9:00 a.m. on August 15, 2023, in Courtroom 3C. Signed by the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #42 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
August 8, 2023 Filing 43 STIPULATION MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. Responses due by 8/22/2023. (Rickard, Jarrod) Modified text on 8/15/2023 (AC).
August 7, 2023 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN (Second Request) re #39 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. Responses due by 8/21/2023. (Rickard, Jarrod) (discovery)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Stipulation to Extend time to File Amended Discovery Plan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
August 2, 2023 Filing 40 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN (First Request) re #39 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Rickard, Jarrod) (extend) (presiding)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying without Prejudice #38 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order.An amended discovery plan must be filed by 8/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 27, 2023 Filing 38 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler.. (Rickard, Jarrod)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #30 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo for Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #33 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly M. White for Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting #32 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice K. Isaac deVyver for Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony Q. Le for Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 17, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Molly M. White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7364535) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Went, Joseph)
July 17, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by K. Issac deVyver and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7364524) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Went, Joseph)
July 17, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7364515) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Went, Joseph)
July 17, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alicia A. Baiardo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joseph G. Went (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7364487) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Went, Joseph)
July 11, 2023 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00703-GMN-NJK. (no image attached) (RGDG)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Transfer Case. This case is reassigned to Judge Navarro for all further proceedings and the case shall bear the case number 2:23-cv-00703-GMN-NJK. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
July 7, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/17/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/21/2023.(Went, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 7, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO DISTRICT JUDGE GLORIA M. NAVARRO [ECF 19] by Geoff Winkler re #19 Motion.. (Rickard, Jarrod)
July 6, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COUNT IV (NEGLIGENCE) by Geoff Winkler.. (Rickard, Jarrod)
June 28, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (AF)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Re: #21 Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulate protective order is superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Stipulation regarding discovery coordination and case schedule. Discovery due by 10/6/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #15 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
June 22, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Went, Joseph)
June 21, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. Responses due by 7/5/2023. (Rickard, Jarrod) (misc) (nondispositive)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s 17 Certificate of interested parties is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/23/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Went, Joseph)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler.. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Discovery Coordination and Case Schedule by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Rickard, Jarrod) (other) (discovery)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey C. Schneider for Plantiff Geoff Winkler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jarrod L. Rickard. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jason Kellogg for Plantiff Geoff Winkler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jarrod L. Rickard. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Marcelo Diaz-Cortes for Plantiff Geoff Winkler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jarrod L. Rickard. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey C. Schneider and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jarrod Lee Rickard (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7299224) by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jason Kellogg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jarrod Lee Rickard (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7299212) by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marcelo Diaz-Cortes and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jarrod Lee Rickard (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7299205) by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 12, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geoff Winkler re #4 Summons Issued. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. waiver sent on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 12, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geoff Winkler. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:22-cv-00612; 2:22-cv-00529 by Plaintiff Geoff Winkler. Pursuant to LR 42-1. (Rickard, Jarrod)
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (LOE)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey C. Schneider, Marcelo Diaz-Cortes, Jason K. Kellog to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/19/2023. (no image attached) (LOE)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 5, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (LOE)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7289331) by Geoff Winkler. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/14/2023. Proof of service due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rickard, Jarrod) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Winkler
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Jason Kellogg
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Schneider
Represented By: Katie Lynn Cannata
Represented By: Marcelo Diaz-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Consulting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J and J Purchasing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Sydney Gambee
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Represented By: Alicia Baiardo
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Represented By: K. Issac deVyver
Represented By: Molly M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?