Argonaut Insurance Company v. Paysign, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Defendant: Paysign, Inc., Mark R. Newcomer, Mark Attinger, Daniel R Henry, Joan M. Herman, Bruce A. Mina, Daniel H. Spence, Dennis Triplett and Quinn Williams
Case Number: 2:2023cv00713
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Mark Attinger answer due 7/28/2023; Daniel R Henry answer due 7/28/2023; Joan M. Herman answer due 7/28/2023; Bruce A. Mina answer due 7/28/2023; Mark R. Newcomer answer due 7/28/2023; Paysign, Inc. answer due 7/28/2023; Daniel H. Spence answer due 7/28/2023; Dennis Triplett answer due 7/28/2023; Quinn Williams answer due 7/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
June 28, 2023 Filing 16 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/12/2023. (Olster, Jeffrey) (answer) Modified on 6/28/2023 (HAM).
May 25, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Attinger, Daniel R Henry, Joan M. Herman, Bruce A. Mina, Mark R. Newcomer, Paysign, Inc., Daniel H. Spence, Dennis Triplett, Quinn Williams. (AMMi)
May 25, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Mark Attinger by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Joan M. Herman by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Bruce A. Mina by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Daniel H. Spence by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Dennis Triplett by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Quinn Williams by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Paysign, Inc. by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Mark R. Newcomer by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued - Daniel Henry by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Argonaut Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Argo Group US, Inc., Other Affiliate Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Argonaut Insurance Company added. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiff. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/23/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/9/2023. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company has failed to do so. Accordingly, Argonaut Insurance Company must file a certificate of interested parties no later than May 16, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AJZ)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 8, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (LOE)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7290960) by Argonaut Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/15/2023. Proof of service due by 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Olster, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut Insurance Company v. Paysign, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paysign, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Newcomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Attinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan M. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Mina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?