Onemata Corporation v. Rahman et al
Plaintiff: Onemata Corporation
Defendant: Ashfaq Rahman, Sabira Arefin, MaskGene LLC, Ran Chae, Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust, Peacenheaven LLC, Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust, The Rahman/Arefin Living Trust, HomeLein Investment LLC, BashaBari LLC, Sunshine Irrevocable Trust, Lakemont Property LLC and HomeLien Investment Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00785
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 36 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants BashaBari LLC, Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust, Lakemont Property LLC, MaskGene LLC, Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust, Peacenheaven LLC, Sunshine Irrevocable Trust. Responses due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Kevin) (answer)
June 21, 2023 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. (Merrill, David)
June 21, 2023 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. (Merrill, David)
June 21, 2023 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. Ran Chae served on 6/8/2023. (Merrill, David)
June 11, 2023 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. Peacenheaven LLC served on 6/1/2023. (Merrill, David)
June 11, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. MaskGene LLC served on 6/1/2023. (Merrill, David)
June 11, 2023 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. Lakemont Property LLC served on 6/1/2023. (Merrill, David)
June 11, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Onemata Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. BashaBari LLC served on 6/1/2023. (Merrill, David)
June 6, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Onemata Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Merrill, David)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony L. Leffert for Onemata Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel David J. Merrill. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/31/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 31, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony L. Leffert and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Merrill (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7315101) by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 30, 2023 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Onemata Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/6/2023. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 30, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (CAH)
May 26, 2023 Filing 23 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sunshine Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ashfaq Rahman by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ashfaq Rahman, Trustee of the Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ashfaq Rahman, Trustee of the Rahman/Arefin Living Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ashfaq Rahman, Trustee of the Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Peacenheaven LLC by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued MaskGene LLC by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued The Rahman/Arefin Living Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Lakemont Property LLC by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued HomeLien Investment Ltd. by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued HomeLien Investment LLC by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ran Chae, Trustee of the Sunshine Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ran Chae, Trustee of the Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ran Chae, Trustee of the Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued BashaBari LLC by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sabira Arefin by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sabira Arefin, Trustee of the Sunshine Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sabira Arefin, Trustee of the Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sabira Arefin, Trustee of the Rahman/Arefin Living Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 26, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sabira Arefin, Trustee of the Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust by Plaintiff Onemata Corporation. (Merrill, David)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7304795) by Onemata Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/29/2023. Proof of service due by 8/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merrill, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 19, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (AMMi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onemata Corporation v. Rahman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onemata Corporation
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Represented By: Anthony L Leffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashfaq Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabira Arefin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaskGene LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ran Chae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Stars Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peacenheaven LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Valley Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rahman/Arefin Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeLein Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BashaBari LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakemont Property LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeLien Investment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?