Garvey v. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wayan Garvey
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc. and Britney Gaitan
Case Number: 2:2023cv00920
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Motion to Extend Time. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2023. (Ayers, Michael) (answer)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants Keller Williams to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 9/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ayers, Michael)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Ayers, Michael) (extend) (answer)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Britney Gaitan answer due 9/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Britney Gaitan. Responses due by 8/23/2023. (Walther, Eric) (answer)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Max S. Morgan for Plaintiff Wayan Garvey and approving Designation of Local Counsel Craig K. Perry. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Patrick J Reilly for Britney Gaitan substituted for Attorney Bradley T Austin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/3/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Max S. Morgan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Craig K. Perry (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7384014) by Plaintiff Wayan Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Perry, Craig)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric Walther in for Attorney Bradley Austin by Defendant Britney Gaitan. Responses due by 8/16/2023. (Walther, Eric)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Britney Gaitan answer due 8/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendant Britney Gaitan to Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Britney Gaitan. Responses due by 7/24/2023. (Austin, Bradley) (answer)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayan Garvey re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. served on 6/15/2023. (Perry, Craig)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayan Garvey re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Britney Gaitan served on 6/21/2023. (Perry, Craig)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00920-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (KF)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on June 14, 2023.With good cause appearing, Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Chris R Miltenberger, Eric H. Weitz, and Max S. Morgan to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/27/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Britney Gaitan, Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (JQC)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Wayan Garvey. (Perry, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Wayan Garvey. (Perry, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wayan Garvey. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Perry, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7326938) by Wayan Garvey. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/22/2023. Proof of service due by 9/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Perry, Craig) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvey v. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayan Garvey
Represented By: Craig K. Perry
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Represented By: Eric H. Weitz
Represented By: Max S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Gaitan
Represented By: Eric D. Walther
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?