Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. v. SledNV, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.
Defendant: SledNV, Inc., Kyle Wieben and Jason Murchison
Case Number: 2:2023cv01068
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Filing 16 EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO MAKE ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS SLEDNV, INC., KYLE WIEBEN, AND JASON MURCHISON by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Boyle, James) (nondispositive)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Collin D. Hansen for Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujan. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/1/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian N. Platt for Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujuan. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/1/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Collin D. Hansen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7378987) by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Lujan, Jessica)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Brian N. Platt, by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Lujan, Jessica)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian N. Platt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7378933) by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Lujan, Jessica)
July 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Collin D. Hansen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/31/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brian N. Platt to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/31/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Murchison, SledNV, Inc., Kyle Wieben. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (AMMi)
July 13, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Jason Murchison by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
July 13, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Kyle Wieben by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued SledNV, Inc. by Plaintiff Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (AMMi)
July 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brian N. Platt, Collin D. Hansen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/26/2023. (no image attached) (AMMi)
July 11, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Joseph Royer, Other Affiliate Francy Royer, Other Affiliate Michael Royer for Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. added. (Boyle, James)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SledNV, Inc., Kyle Wieben, Jason Murchison (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7358490) by Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/21/2023. Proof of service due by 10/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyle, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc. v. SledNV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Mountain Heli-Ski Guides, Inc.
Represented By: James Daniel Boyle
Represented By: Brian N Platt
Represented By: Collin D. Hansen
Represented By: Jessica M. Lujan
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SledNV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Wieben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Murchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?