Johanna Bruton et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Johanna Bruton and Daniel F. Espy
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01291
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Johanna Bruton, Daniel F. Espy. Replies due by 10/20/2023. (Harker, Michael)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #12 , #13 . Responses due by 10/13/2023. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and to Postpone Filing their Discovery Plan. The parties must file a proposed discovery plan fourteen days after the Court rules on Defendants motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
October 5, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #13 Motion to Dismiss, #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Johanna Bruton, Daniel F. Espy. (Harker, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
October 4, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY and the Filing of a Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #13 Motion to Dismiss, #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company. (Coles, Madeleine) (stay) (nondispositive)
September 22, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Lawrence, Troy)
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company. Responses due by 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Tasca, Joel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendant Bank of America, N.A... (Lawrence, Troy)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Petition for Removal. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 9/22/2023; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company answer due 9/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
September 13, 2023 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (SECOND REQUEST) by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company. (Tasca, Joel) (other) (answer)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Bank of America, N.A... (Lachman, Scott)
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Troy A Lawrence on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Lawrence, Troy)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Stipulation. Defendants shall have up to and including September 15, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 First STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (First Request) by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company. (Coles, Madeleine) (other) (answer)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Bank of America, N.A... (Lachman, Scott)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/23/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/7/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 23, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A., a corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Bank of America, N.A., Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A., a corporation added.. (Lachman, Scott)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-873500-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7399817) by Bank of America, N.A., a corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lachman, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johanna Bruton et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Bruton
Represented By: Michael J. Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F. Espy
Represented By: Michael J. Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Scott Robert Lachman
Represented By: Troy A Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Represented By: Madeleine Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?