Chapman-Pinto v. Amazon.Com Services LLC
Plaintiff: Katie Chapman-Pinto
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01458
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amazon.com Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amazon.com Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC added.. (Kim, Emil)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/20/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/16/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2023. (Krincek, Wendy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC answer due 11/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Kim, Emil) (extend) (answer)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Katie Chapman-Pinto. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Balaban, Michael)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com Services, LLC re #1 Complaint. (AMMi)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7430614) by Katie Chapman-Pinto. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/29/2023. Proof of service due by 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 19, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman-Pinto v. Amazon.Com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Chapman-Pinto
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Emil S Kim
Represented By: Wendy Krincek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?