Newrez LLC v. Parsons et al.
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Defendant: Kelly Parsons, Vicki Parsons, Kevin Stewart, Melissa Pehrson, Daniel Stewart, Individually, as Representative of The Estate of Dale J. Stewart, and as Trustee of The Dale Stewart Irrevocable Memorial Trust, Kamerin Tangero, as Representative of The Estate of Dale J. Stewart, Daniel Stewart and Kamerin Tangero
Cross Claimant: Andrew Stewart
Case Number: 2:2023cv01544
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart, Kevin Stewart, Kamerin Tangero that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Wood, Brittany)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Certificate of Interested Parties (ECF No. #24 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). The certificate does not identify the citizenship of each defendant as required by the amendment to that rule. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/30/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelly Parsons re #23 Answer to Amended Complaint. (RGDG)
November 15, 2023 Filing 25 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Kelly Parsons by Cross Claimants Andrew Stewart, Kamerin Tangero. (Wood, Brittany)
November 15, 2023 Filing 24 STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. 4 ORDER : CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart, Kevin Stewart, Kamerin Tangero that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Wood, Brittany) Modified on 11/16/2023 to denote STRICKEN (GA).
November 15, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/25/2023., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2023.), CROSSCLAIM against Kelly Parsons by Kamerin Tangero, Kevin Stewart, Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart. filed by Kamerin Tangero, Kevin Stewart, Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart.(Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 25, 2023 Filing 22 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart, Kevin Stewart, Kamerin Tangero on 10/25/2023 executed by NewRez LLC re #7 Amended Complaint,. (Magaster, Paige)
October 25, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelly Parsons, Vicki Parsons re #7 Amended Complaint. (RGDG)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Deeming Order to Show Cause Satisfied.The order to show cause (ECF No. #6 ) is satisfied, and this action will not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Vicki Parsons by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 23, 2023 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Kelly Parsons by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 23, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelly Parsons, Vicki Parsons, Melissa Pehrson, Andrew Stewart, Daniel Stewart, Kevin Stewart, Kamerin Tangero re #7 Amended Complaint. (CAH)
October 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Amended Lis Pendens). (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Kamerin Tangero, as representative of The Estate of Dale J. Stewart by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued DANIEL STEWART, individually by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued DANIEL STEWART, as Trustee of the Dale Stewart Irrevocable Memorial Trust by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued DANIEL STEWART, as Representative of the Estate of Dale J. Stewart by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Melissa Pehrson by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Andrew Stewart by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Kevin Stewart by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by NewRez LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Magaster, Paige)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDER that by October 20, 2023, plaintiff NewRez LLC shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 29, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RGDG)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NewRez LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate NRZ Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Caliber Home Loans Inc., Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corp. for NewRez LLC added.. (Magaster, Paige)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Magaster, Paige)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7443007) by Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/8/2023. Proof of service due by 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Magaster, Paige) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newrez LLC v. Parsons et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Pehrson
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Stewart, Individually, as Representative of The Estate of Dale J. Stewart, and as Trustee of The Dale Stewart Irrevocable Memorial Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamerin Tangero, as Representative of The Estate of Dale J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Stewart
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamerin Tangero
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Andrew Stewart
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?