Som v. Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Chandy Som and Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC doing business as Bahama Breeze
Defendant: Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC dba Bahama Breeze
Case Number: 2:2023cv01561
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #16 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (KF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC. (Eichelberger, Cory)
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Chandy Som. Replies due by 11/22/2023. (Gillock, Gerald)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #13 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Chandy Som. Replies due by 11/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gillock, Gerald)
November 1, 2023 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC.. (Eichelberger, Cory)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2023. (Eichelberger, Cory)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC. Replies due by 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Eichelberger, Cory)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #8 Certificate of Interested Parties and #7 Motion to Remand was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (KF)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chandy Som. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gillock, Gerald)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Chandy Som. Responses due by 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gillock, Gerald)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Plaintiff Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eichelberger, Cory)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Michancy M Cramer is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (KF)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/2/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/17/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
October 2, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (CAH)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC dba Bahama Breeze. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Eichelberger, Cory)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-875164-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7444497) by Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC dba Bahama Breeze. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Eichelberger, Cory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Som v. Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandy Som
Represented By: Ashley Watkins
Represented By: Daniel John McAdorey
Represented By: Gerald Ivey Gillock
Represented By: Timothy Ryan O'Reilly
Represented By: Samuel Mirejovsky
Represented By: Michael Hunter Coggeshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC doing business as Bahama Breeze
Represented By: Cory Eichelberger
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Represented By: Michancy M Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahama Breeze Holdings LLC dba Bahama Breeze
Represented By: Cory Eichelberger
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Represented By: Michancy M Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?