Orso v. Bentley
Case Number: 2:2023cv01644
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Pending before the Court is an order to show cause for failure to prosecute. Docket No. 10 . A response was filed. Docket No. 12 . In light of the subsequent motion to substitute, which was granted, Docket Nos. 11 , 13 , the order to show cause is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff must diligently advance this case moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. ECF No. 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to substitute Plaintiff Matthew E. Orso with Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orso v. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?