Coney v. Lozo et al
Plaintiff: William Coney
Defendant: Officer Michael Lozo, Officer A. Mariscal, Joseph Lombardo and Clark County Council
Case Number: 2:2023cv01645
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cristina D Silva
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 , #7 is GRANTED; provided, however, that in forma pauperis status shall not be extended to the issuance and/or service of subpoenas at government expense. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not be required to pay an initial installment fee; however, the filing fee is still due under 28 U.S.C. 1915 as amended by the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), the Clark County Detention Center (CCDC) shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding months deposits to the account of William Coney, #538576 (in months that the account exceeds $10.00) until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid for this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to the CCDC Accounting Supervisor, 330 S. Casino Center Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/8/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc CCDC Accounting Supervisor via Mail - CAH)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Coney. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(CAH)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff William Coney. Prior Address: William Coney 538576,Clark County Detention Center,330 South Casino Center,Las Vegas, NV 89101. (ALZ)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than November 17, 2023 Plaintiff must file an updated address with the Court.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation to dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to William Coney. (CAH)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before December 11, 2023, Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee for a civil action or file with the Court: (1) a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Inmate on the Courts approved form; (2) a Financial Certificate properly signed by both the inmate and a prison or jail official; and (3) a copy of the inmates prison or jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to either pay the $402 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before December 11, 2023, will result in a recommendation to dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc IFP Packet mailed to Plaintiff - CAH)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff William Coney. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(GA)
October 10, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coney v. Lozo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Coney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Lozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer A. Mariscal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?