Estrada v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Estrada
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Nevada New Builds LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01767
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Nevada New Build LLC obo Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada re #18 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (WJ)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting ECF No. #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Response re ECF No. #13 Motion to Stay Discovery is due by 1/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation to File a Reply to #4 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 12/19/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
December 15, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada. (Hanks, Karen) (extend) (answer)
December 15, 2023 Filing 22 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Coles, Madeleine) (extend) (sumjgm)
December 12, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada. Replies due by 12/19/2023. (Hanks, Karen)
December 11, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation #19 for Extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendant's Motion #4 to Dismiss on or before December 13, 2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLG)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada. (Hanks, Karen) (extend) (answer)
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada. Responses due by 12/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanks, Karen)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #16 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #16 using the appropriate docket entry title of 'Motion Entry of Clerks Default' located under Motions and Stipulations. (no image attached) (CJS)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel for Entry of Default re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanks, Karen)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/6/2024. Motions due by 6/5/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/1/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/4/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Extend Time #12 to File Joint Status Report is GRANTED nunc pro tunc.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLG)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 12/15/2023. (Coles, Madeleine)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL re #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 12/15/2023. (Coles, Madeleine) (presiding)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.. (Coles, Madeleine)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada.. (Hanks, Karen)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/20/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by December 11, 2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLG)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada. (Hanks, Karen) (extend) (sumjgm)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Elizabeth Estrada.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavits of Service)(Hanks, Karen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.. (Coles, Madeleine)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Freddie Mac, Other Affiliate Federal Housing Finance Agency for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation added.. (Coles, Madeleine)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Coles, Madeleine)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/31/2023. By Deputy Clerk: ALZ. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/15/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
October 31, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ALZ)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-877772-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7476825) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coles, Madeleine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Estrada
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Represented By: Madeleine Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada New Builds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?