Newhouse v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Newhouse
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams and HDSP Medical Dept.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01833
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Kevin Newhouse. (GA)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the #1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until January 19, 2024, to either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Kevin Newhouse the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but not file it at this time. (IFP Inmate Packet attached herein for distribution to P via HDSP Law Library) See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Inmate Packet) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin Newhouse. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(DLS)
November 8, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newhouse v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Newhouse
Represented By: Law Library - High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDSP Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?