NewRez LLC v. Haddad et al
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and New Penn Financial
Defendant: Iyad Haddad, Eddie Haddad, Resources Group, LLC, 9863 Dublin Valley, LLC, Saticoy Bay LLC doing business as Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St
Case Number: 2:2023cv01839
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Iyad Haddad, Saticoy Bay LLC, Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St on 1/3/2024 executed by NewRez LLC re #10 Summons Issued. (Magaster, Paige)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by 9863 Dublin Valley, LLC, Resources Group, LLC, Resources Group, LLC(as Trustee of Teal Petals St Trust) on 12/28/2023 executed by NewRez LLC re #1 Complaint,, #10 Summons Issued. (Magaster, Paige)
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. . (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 9863 Dublin Valley, LLC, Iyad Haddad, Resources Group, LLC, Resources Group, LLC(as Trustee of Teal Petals St Trust), Saticoy Bay LLC, Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St re #1 Complaint. (RGDG)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Saticoy Bay LLC dba Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued 9863 Dublin Valley, LLC by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Resources Group LLC as Trustee of Teal Petals St Trust by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Resources Group LLC by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Iyad Haddad aka Eddie Haddad by Plaintiff NewRez LLC. (Magaster, Paige)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NewRez LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate Caliber Homes Loans, Other Affiliate NRZ Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corp. for NewRez LLC added.. (Magaster, Paige)
November 9, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RGDG)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Responses due by 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Magaster, Paige)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7488810) by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/18/2023. Proof of service due by 2/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Magaster, Paige) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NewRez LLC v. Haddad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Penn Financial
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iyad Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9863 Dublin Valley, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC doing business as Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9863 Dublin Valley St
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?