Kurtev et al v. Cook County Health & Hospital System et al
Plaintiff: Martin Kurtev and Izabela Debowczyk
Defendant: Cook County Health & Hospital System and Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01905
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01905-RFB-MDC. (no image attached) (LG)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Cook County Health & Hospital System answer/response re ECF No. #1 due 1/29/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 26, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to respond to complaint by Defendant Cook County Health & Hospital System. (Flynn, Sean) (extend) (answer)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan A. Rich on behalf of Defendant Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Rich, Jonathan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Kurtev, Izabela Debowczyk re #1 Complaint,,. Cook County Health & Hospital System served on 12/11/2023. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 Copy of Errata re Motion for Transfer filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (CT)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Copy of MOTION for Transfer filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (CT)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Kurtev, Izabela Debowczyk. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. served on 11/21/2023. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook County Health & Hospital System re #1 Complaint. (CAH)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued (Alias Summons to Cook County Health & Hospitals System) by Plaintiffs Izabela Debowczyk, Martin Kurtev. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Izabela Debowczyk, Martin Kurtev. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas A Zimmermann Jr. for Martin Kurtev and Izabela Debowczyk and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Christopher S. Connell. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/28/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher S. Connell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7504955) by Plaintiffs Izabela Debowczyk, Martin Kurtev. (Connell, Christopher)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Izabela Debowczyk, Martin Kurtev. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Connell, Christopher)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/1/2023. (no image attached) (CAH)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook County Health & Hospital System, Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CAH)
November 17, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (CAH)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7498637) by Martin Kurtev, Izabela Debowczyk. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/27/2023. Proof of service due by 2/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Connell, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurtev et al v. Cook County Health & Hospital System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kurtev
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izabela Debowczyk
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Health & Hospital System
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?