Belov et al v. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: ANATOLI BELOV, IRINA BELOVA and ERYN KAPLAN
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01925
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Langley for Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, and Eryn Kaplan and approving Designation of Local Counsel Attorney Jennifer A. Fornetti. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Langley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer A. Fornetti (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7536556) by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. (Fornetti, Jennifer)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan A. Rich on behalf of Defendant Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Rich, Jonathan)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Copy of Errata re Motion for Transfer filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (CT)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Copy of MOTION for Transfer filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (CT)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to David S. Almeida for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Jennifer A. Fornetti. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/12/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David S. Almeida and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer A. Fornetti (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7520453) by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. (Fornetti, Jennifer)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Britany A. Kabakov for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer A. Fornetti. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/11/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Britany A. Kabakov and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer A. Fornetti (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7519423) by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. (Fornetti, Jennifer)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anatoli Belov, Eryn Kaplan, Irina Belova re #1 Complaint,,. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. served on 12/1/2023. (Fornetti, Jennifer)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE IN THIS CASE ONLY BY ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT AND DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL re 6 Standing Order, by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. (Fornetti, Jennifer) (nondispositive)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) TO FILE VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE IN THIS CASE ONLY BY ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT AND DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL re 6 Standing Order, by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. Responses due by 12/18/2023. (Fornetti, Jennifer) (referral)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-CV-01910-RFB-EJY, 2:23-CV-01926, 1:23-CV-08627, 2:23-CV-08583, 2:23-CV-01905-RBF-VCF, 2:23-CV-01900-RFB-DJA, 2:23-CV-08544, 2:23-CV-01892-ART-NJK, 2:23-CV-08517, 2:23-CV-01880-RFB-DJA, 2:23-CV-08467, 2:23-CV-01874-CDS-DJA, 2:23-CV-01866-CDS-EJY, 2:23-CV-01857-RFB-NJK, 2:23-CV-01851-CDS-EJY, 2023-CH-09293 by Plaintiffs Anatoli Belov, Irina Belova, Eryn Kaplan. . (Fornetti, Jennifer)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (CAH)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Britany A. Kabakov and David S. Almeida to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/4/2023. (no image attached) (CAH)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ANATOLI BELOV, IRINA BELOVA, ERYN KAPLAN. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fornetti, Jennifer)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7500485) by ANATOLI BELOV, ERYN KAPLAN, IRINA BELOVA. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/30/2023. Proof of service due by 2/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Fornetti, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belov et al v. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANATOLI BELOV
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRINA BELOVA
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERYN KAPLAN
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?