Doe et al v. State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. et al
Plaintiff: D.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, L.O.J. John Doe and P.K. Jane Doe
Defendant: State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. and Stacey Silverstein
Case Number: 2:2023cv01929
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
2 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
3 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Future requests for extensions must comply with LR IA 6-1(a) and inform the Court of any prior extensions. Stacey Silverstein answer due 1/23/2024; State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. answer due 1/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 1/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs.. (Rowe, Izaac) (extend) (answer)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Document, #14 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Stacey Silverstein. Responses due by 1/26/2024. (Galati, Felicia)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Stacey Silverstein. Responses due by 1/26/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/22/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/26/2024. (Galati, Felicia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01929-APG-MDC. (no image attached) (LG)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Stacey Silverstein answer/response re ECF No. #1 due 1/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Stacey Silverstein. (Galati, Felicia) (extend) (answer)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.O.J. John Doe, D.O. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, P.K. Jane Doe re #9 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. served on 11/30/2023. (Ford, Cory)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.O.J. John Doe, D.O. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, P.K. Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. served on 12/1/2023. (Ford, Cory)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.O.J. John Doe, D.O. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, P.K. Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Stacey Silverstein served on 11/27/2023. (Ford, Cory)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01929-APG-VCF. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 11/27/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stacey Silverstein, State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. re #1 Complaint. (RGDG)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RGDG)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Pseudonym re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs D.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, L.O.J. John Doe, P.K. Jane Doe. Responses due by 12/4/2023. (Ford, Cory) (misc) (nondispositive)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by D.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, L.O.J. John Doe, P.K. Jane Doe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ford, Cory)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stacey Silverstein, State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7500782) by L.O.J. John Doe, D.O. Jane Doe, L.O. Jane Doe, K.Y. Jane Doe, P.K. Jane Doe. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/30/2023. Proof of service due by 2/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.O. Jane Doe
Represented By: Cory Ford
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.Y. Jane Doe
Represented By: Cory Ford
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O. Jane Doe
Represented By: Cory Ford
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.J. John Doe
Represented By: Cory Ford
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.K. Jane Doe
Represented By: Cory Ford
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, Ex. Rel., Dep't of Health & Hum. Servs. Div. of Child and Family Servs.
Represented By: Izaac Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Silverstein
Represented By: Felicia Galati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?