Admiral Insurance Company v. Maksin et al
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Defendant: Steven Maksin and Natalie Maksin
Case Number: 2:2023cv01943
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Admiral Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Admiral Insurance Company added. (Downs, Andrew)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties. Plaintiffs certificate of interested parties fails to identify the citizenship attributed to it. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file an amended certificate of interested parties by December 5, 2023, fully identifying the citizenship of every individual and entity attributed to it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Natalie Maksin, Steven Maksin re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AMMi)
November 22, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Admiral Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Admiral Insurance Company added. (Downs, Andrew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7502555) by Admiral Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/2/2023. Proof of service due by 2/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Summons Steven Maksin, #6 Summons Natalie Maksin, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Downs, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company v. Maksin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Represented By: Tracy DiFillippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Maksin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Maksin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?