teamLab Inc. v. Arte Museum LV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: teamLab Inc.
Defendant: Arte Museum LV, LLC, Dstrict Holdings, Inc., Dstrict Korea Inc., D'strict Holdings, Inc and D'strict Korea Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01956
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jenevieve J. Maerker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7558701) by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificates of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 18, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #19 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Patrick J. Rodgers, by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificates of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #18 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Yoonhee Kim, by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificates of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 18, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Maxime Jarquin, by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 18, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #15 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Danny M. Awdeh, by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificates of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2024. NOTICE OF ACTION REQUIRED. Re: #15 , #17 , #18 , and #19 . The verified petitions do not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). Counsel purports to represent both defendants in this case, but failed to provide a signature and name for Arte Museum LV, LLC on the final page of the petitions. #15 , #18 , and #19 also do not comply with LR IA 11-2(b)(3). Counsel failed to attach the required "certification issued within six months before the date of filing of the verified petition [showing] that the applicant's membership is in good standing from the state bar or from the clerk of court of the supreme court or highest admitting court of every state, territory, or insular possession of the United States in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law." In the petition at #15 , Counsel filed a certificate of good standing from the District of Columbia, but the petition states that the petitioner is also admitted in Tennessee. In the petition at #18 , Counsel filed a certificate of good standing from the District of Columbia, but the petition states that the petitioner is also admitted in Virginia. In the petition at #19 , Counsel filed a certificate of good standing from the District of Columbia, but the petition states that the petitioner is also admitted in Florida. Counsel is advised to obtain the required certifications, attach them to amended petitions that contain names and signatures for both parties, file the amended petitions under the event titled "Notice of Corrected Image/Document," and link the amended petitions to the originally filed petitions within 10 days of this order. Failure to do so will result in the denial of the petitions without prejudice to refiling corrected applications.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MH)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Rodgers and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7550869) by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Yoonhee Kim and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7550843) by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Maxime Jarquin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7550830) by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael LaFond for teamLab Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Danny M. Awdeh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7550775) by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Rabe, Bethany)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Goldstein for teamLab Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C. Posner for teamLab Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael LaFond and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7549079) by Plaintiff teamLab Inc.. (Kohli, Eric)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Goldstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7549071) by Plaintiff teamLab Inc.. (Kohli, Eric)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel C. Posner and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric N. Kohli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7549059) by Plaintiff teamLab Inc.. (Kohli, Eric)
December 26, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MFIO Global Discovery Limited for D'strict Holdings, Inc added.. (Rabe, Bethany)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' response re ECF No. #1 is due by March 4, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Complaint and to Waive Service by Defendants Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, Inc, D'strict Korea Inc.. (Rabe, Bethany) (extend) (answer)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by teamLab Inc.. D'strict Holdings, Inc served on 11/28/2023. (Kohli, Eric)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by teamLab Inc.. Arte Museum LV, LLC served on 11/27/2023. (Kohli, Eric)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. E-mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arte Museum LV, LLC, D'strict Holdings, INC, D'strict Korea Inc. re #1 Complaint. (CT)
November 27, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CT)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by teamLab Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kohli, Eric)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7503734) by teamLab Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/2/2023. Proof of service due by 2/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Kohli, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: teamLab Inc. v. Arte Museum LV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: teamLab Inc.
Represented By: Eric Kohli
Represented By: Daniel C Posner
Represented By: Michael LaFond
Represented By: Ryan Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arte Museum LV, LLC
Represented By: Bethany L. Rabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dstrict Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dstrict Korea Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'strict Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Bethany L. Rabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'strict Korea Inc.
Represented By: Bethany L. Rabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?