United States of America v. Sachs et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Procloak Series II., LLC, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Adam Sachs, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The Bank of New York as successor Trustee of CSFB Home Equity Mortgage Trust Series 2004-1 and Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01966
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin A Schuler-Hintz on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Schuler-Hintz, Kristin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint,,. Adam Sachs served on 12/4/2023. (Linder, Herbert)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint,,. Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc. served on 12/7/2023. (Linder, Herbert)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint,,. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 12/5/2023. (Linder, Herbert)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint,,. Wells Fargo Bank NA served on 12/4/2023. (Linder, Herbert)
December 26, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by PHH Mortgage Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation added.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Allison, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 ERRATA to #7 Answer to Complaint, by Defendants Procloak Series II., LLC, Adam Sachs.. (Perez, Shawn)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Procloak Series II., LLC, Adam Sachs. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Perez, Shawn)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 REFER to ECF No. #9 Errata - ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Procloak Series II., LLC, Adam Sachs. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/29/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/2/2024.(Perez, Shawn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 12/19/2023 (CJS).
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHH Mortgage Corporation, Procloak Series II., LLC, Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., Adam Sachs, The Bank of New York as successor Trustee of CSFB Home Equity Mortgage Trust Series 2004-1, Wells Fargo Bank NA re #1 Complaint. (CT)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that pursuant to the recusal of Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01966-APG-BNW. (no image attached) (CJS)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/29/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Linder, Herbert)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/8/2023. Proof of service due by 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties) (Linder, Herbert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 28, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sachs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Herbert W. Linder
Represented By: Summer Allegra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procloak Series II., LLC
Represented By: Shawn R Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Sachs
Represented By: Shawn R Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York as successor Trustee of CSFB Home Equity Mortgage Trust Series 2004-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?