SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv01991
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/5/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/11/2024.(Miller, Christina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation to Extend Time Period to Respond to Complaint. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/26/2024; PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Dragon, Lindsay) (extend) (answer)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVED CASE by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Dragon, Lindsay)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/29/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC.. (Schimming, Chantel)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.. (Dragon, Lindsay)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation re #1 Petition for Removal,,.. (Dragon, Lindsay)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 to Extend Time Period to Respond to Complaint. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/5/2024; PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Dragon, Lindsay) (extend) (answer)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01991-GMN-EJY. (no image attached) (KF)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/19/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
December 4, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (CT)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Dragon, Lindsay)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-23-880556-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7511156) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Dragon, Lindsay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay D. Dragon
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay D. Dragon
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?