Worthams v. GEICO Choice Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Willie Worthams
Defendant: GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP and Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP
Case Number: 2:2024cv00023
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 47 ERRATA to #43 Motion, #32 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. (Bowen, Jerome)
February 27, 2024 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #45 Joint Motion to Extend Time (First Request) is GRANTED. Defendant Lewis Roca will file its reply brief before or on March 5, 2024.Clerk status check on 3/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW)
February 26, 2024 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Reply re #32 Motion to Dismiss, #40 Response by Defendant Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. Responses due by 3/11/2024. (Smith, Abraham) (sumjgm)
February 26, 2024 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/26/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #43 Motion to Redact is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is instructed to file a Motion to Seal and provide the Court with a redacted version of the document before or on February 28, 2024. The Clerk of Court is instructed to temporarily seal the document.Clerk status check on 2/28/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW)
February 23, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION to Redact Social Security Number re #40 Response by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. Responses due by 3/8/2024. (Bowen, Jerome) (misc) (dispositive)
February 23, 2024 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/23/2024. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #41 Stipulation for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Defendant's Reply brief is due before or on March 5, 2024.Clerk status check on 3/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW)
February 22, 2024 Filing 41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #39 Response by Defendant Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. (Olster, Jeffrey) (extend) (sumjgm)
February 20, 2024 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #32 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. Replies due by 2/27/2024. (Bowen, Jerome)
February 20, 2024 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #30 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. Replies due by 2/27/2024. (Bowen, Jerome)
February 17, 2024 Filing 38 JOINDER to #30 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. (Smith, Abraham)
February 12, 2024 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/12/2024. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #35 #36 Stipulations for Extension of Time (First Requests) are GRANTED.Clerk status check on 2/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW)
February 9, 2024 Filing 36 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #30 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. (Bowen, Jerome) (extend) (sumjgm)
February 9, 2024 Filing 35 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #32 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Willie Worthams. (Bowen, Jerome) (extend) (sumjgm)
February 2, 2024 Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 33 JOINDER to #32 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. (Olster, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. Responses due by 2/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Abraham)
January 26, 2024 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Scott Bentivenga, Other Affiliate Josh Aicklen, Other Affiliate David Avakian, Other Affiliate Scott Bartel, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Bash, Other Affiliate Jonathan Beckerman, Other Affiliate Bentivenga, Other Affiliate Nichol Bunn, Other Affiliate Joseph Campo, Other Affiliate Frank Cannizzaro, Other Affiliate Meghan Cavalieri, Other Affiliate Jason Chermela, Other Affiliate Alexander Comis, Other Affiliate Thomas Cortazzo, Other Affiliate Tracy Cowan, Other Affiliate Alexis Crump, Other Affiliate Darrell Dennis, Other Affiliate Todd Ehrenreich, Other Affiliate Connie Fickel, Other Affiliate Dana Fox, Other Affiliate Robert Freeman, Jr., Other Affiliate Seth Friedman, Other Affiliate Glenn Friedman, Other Affiliate Steven Gatley, Other Affiliate Jeff Gaylord, Other Affiliate Michelle Gilboe, Other Affiliate Judd Gilefsky, Other Affiliate Richard Glauser, Other Affiliate Jonathan Goken, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Goldwater, Other Affiliate Jill Grathwohl, Other Affiliate Todd Gray, Other Affiliate Colin Hackett, Other Affiliate James Hailey III, Other Affiliate Jason Hall, Other Affiliate Matthew Harrison, Other Affiliate William Helfand, Other Affiliate Craig Holden, Other Affiliate Esther Holm, Other Affiliate Trevor Ingold, Other Affiliate Angeline Ioannou, Other Affiliate Reuben Jacobson, Other Affiliate Michael Jaeger, Other Affiliate Joshua Jemal, Other Affiliate Heather Jensen, Other Affiliate John Jessee, Other Affiliate Kenneth Joyce, Other Affiliate Alan Kaminsky, Other Affiliate Jon Kardassakis, Other Affiliate Gregory Katz, Other Affiliate David Kern, Other Affiliate Eric Kizirian, Other Affiliate Matthew Kleifield, Other Affiliate Chang Lee, Other Affiliate Karl Loureiro, Other Affiliate John Lowenthal, Other Affiliate Jana Lubert, Other Affiliate Gregory Lynch, Other Affiliate Thomas Mannion, Other Affiliate George Manos, Other Affiliate Ronald Masterson, Other Affiliate Florence McClain, Other Affiliate Michael McLain, Other Affiliate Jennifer Michel, Other Affiliate Malinda Miller, Other Affiliate Jeffry Miller, Other Affiliate Marilyn Moriarty, Other Affiliate Renee Mortimer, Other Affiliate Lauren Motola-Davis, Other Affiliate Joelle Nelson, Other Affiliate Christopher Nevis, Other Affiliate Kevin Nicholas, Other Affiliate Ryan Nilsen, Other Affiliate Mark Oertel, Other Affiliate Jennifer Oetter, Other Affiliate Erin O'Leary, Other Affiliate Gregory Olsen, Other Affiliate Philip O'Rourke, Other Affiliate David Oubre, Other Affiliate Jennifer Oxman, Other Affiliate Julian Pardini, Other Affiliate Matthew Pascale, Other Affiliate Andrew Pidgirsky, Other Affiliate Francis Pileggi, Other Affiliate Michael Platner, Other Affiliate David Pollack, Other Affiliate John Poulos, Other Affiliate Charles Reed, Other Affiliate Thomas Regan, Other Affiliate Bryan Reid, Other Affiliate John Rine, Other Affiliate Alexandra Rothstein, Other Affiliate Brantley Rowlen, Other Affiliate Alan Rupe, Other Affiliate Rima Said-Badawiya, Other Affiliate Anthony Sain, Other Affiliate Joseph Salazar Jr, Other Affiliate John Salvucci, Other Affiliate Todd Seelman, Other Affiliate David Shannon, Other Affiliate Peter Shapiro, Other Affiliate Elior Shiloh, Other Affiliate Mary Smigielski, Other Affiliate John Snelling, Other Affiliate Anthony Sonnett, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Spiegel, Other Affiliate Meredith Stoma, Other Affiliate Sana Suhail, Other Affiliate Christine Tenley, Other Affiliate Shawn Toliver, Other Affiliate Judd Uhl, Other Affiliate Michael Velladao, Other Affiliate Brent Vogel, Other Affiliate Kathleen Walker, Other Affiliate Alecia Walters-Hinds, Other Affiliate Keith Weaver, Other Affiliate Seth Weinstein, Other Affiliate James Whalen Jr, Other Affiliate Darrell Whiteley, Other Affiliate Cheryl Wilke, Other Affiliate Timothy Windham, Other Affiliate Cristina Yannucci, Other Affiliate Timothy Young, Other Affiliate John Yung, Other Affiliate Charles Harris, Other Affiliate Douglas Lewis, Other Affiliate James Doyle, Other Affiliate John Hill, Other Affiliate Kenneth Walton, Other Affiliate Patrick Foley, Other Affiliate Richard Morgan, Other Affiliate Robert Krause, Other Affiliate Steven Lewis, Other Affiliate Karen Campbell, Other Affiliate Kevin Parsons, Other Affiliate Steven Meyer, Other Affiliate Raul Martinez, Other Affiliate Manuel Flores, Other Affiliate Matthew Nelson, Other Affiliate Joshua Davis, Other Affiliate Sean Healy, Other Affiliate Bradley Fischer for Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP added.. (Olster, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. Responses due by 2/9/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/5/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/11/2024. (Olster, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 26, 2024 Filing 29 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,,, filed by GEICO Choice Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/5/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/11/2024.(Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph N. Glynn for GEICO Choice Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Max Rosen for GEICO Choice Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cary B. Lerman for GEICO Choice Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Amy E Altshuler, Other Affiliate Oliver S. Bajracharya, Other Affiliate Bryant D. Barber, Other Affiliate Edwin Barkel, Other Affiliate Trevor Bartel, Other Affiliate Frederick Baumann, Other Affiliate Kendra N Beckwith, Other Affiliate Warren G Bleeker, Other Affiliate Stephen M. Bressler, Other Affiliate Ogonna Brown, Other Affiliate Scott Browning, Other Affiliate Chad S. Caby, Other Affiliate Joseph A. Chandler, Other Affiliate Josephine Chang, Other Affiliate Samuel S. Chang, Other Affiliate Emily Charlesworth, Other Affiliate Joshua T. Chu, Other Affiliate Justin Cumming, Other Affiliate Michael J. Curry, Other Affiliate Thomas J. Daly, Other Affiliate Pat Derdenger, Other Affiliate Scott Dewalt, Other Affiliate Thomas J. Dougherty, Other Affiliate Justin O. Ehresmann, Other Affiliate Todd Feltus, Other Affiliate Joel C. Fry, Other Affiliate Jessica L. Fuller, Other Affiliate Garrett D. Gordon, Other Affiliate Stephen M. Hart, Other Affiliate Art S. Hasan, Other Affiliate Frances J. Haynes, Other Affiliate Peter C. Hsueh, Other Affiliate Jun-Young E. Jeon, Other Affiliate Lawrence A. Kasten, Other Affiliate Robert Kort, Other Affiliate Kris Kostolansky, Other Affiliate Alex LaCroix, Other Affiliate Gregory S. Lampert, Other Affiliate Peter A. Larson, Other Affiliate Gregory Leibold, Other Affiliate Darren J. Lemieux, Other Affiliate Glenn J. Light, Other Affiliate Laura Lo Bianco, Other Affiliate James Lyons, Other Affiliate William H. Mahaffey, Other Affiliate Constantine Marantidis, Other Affiliate Jason C. Martone, Other Affiliate Paul A. Matteoni, Other Affiliate Michael McCue, Other Affiliate Lindsay L McKae, Other Affiliate Linda M. Mitchell, Other Affiliate Cindy Oliver, Other Affiliate Mark D. Patton, Other Affiliate Michael J. Phalen, Other Affiliate Michael D. Plachy, Other Affiliate D.A. Plumley, Other Affiliate John M. Rawicz, Other Affiliate Robert F. Roos, Other Affiliate Karl F. Rutledge, Other Affiliate Lauren E. Schneider, Other Affiliate Andrew D. Schorr, Other Affiliate Lewis R. Schorr, Other Affiliate Heidi K. Short, Other Affiliate Mary Ellen Simonson, Other Affiliate Brian Spano, Other Affiliate Susan Sperber, Other Affiliate Jan Steinhour, Other Affiliate Matthew C. Sweger, Other Affiliate Raymond R. Tabandeh, Other Affiliate Douglas Tumminello, Other Affiliate Jennifer A. Van Kirk, Other Affiliate Ken Van Winkle, Other Affiliate Michael Scott Wagner, Other Affiliate Dan R. Waite, Other Affiliate Peter R. Wand, Other Affiliate Anne Wang, Other Affiliate Hilary D. Wells, Other Affiliate Holly C, White, Other Affiliate Karen Witt, Other Affiliate Gary Nelson, Other Affiliate James Walker, Other Affiliate Kevin Kelly, Other Affiliate Leif E. Reid, Other Affiliate John E. Bragonje, Other Affiliate Daniel F. Polsenberg, Other Affiliate J. Christopher Jorgensen for Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP added. (Smith, Abraham)
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company.. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 17, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/17/2024. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joseph N. Glynn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7556296) by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Max Rosen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7556293) by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 17, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cary B. Lerman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7556288) by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 17, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on January 12, 2024.RE: Defendants' emergency motion to set a status conference and emergency motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint (ECF Nos. #16 and #17 )WHEREAS, on January 11, 2024, the court received defendants' motion to set a status conference and emergency motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint. (ECF Nos. #16 and #17 ).Defendants seek an extension to file their answer thirty (30) days after the requested status conference occurs.This is defendants' second motion seeking such an extension. The deadline to file their answer is January 16, 2024. Although the court admonishes defendants for filing these concurrent motions in the late evening of January 11, 2024, the jurisdictional issues present good cause to grant an extension to file an answer. However, the court is unsure a status conference is necessary to determine jurisdiction, as a motion to remand may be more appropriate.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' emergency motion to set a status conference (ECF No. #16 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' emergency motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint (ECF No. #17 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer to plaintiff's first amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of this court's order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to First Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendants GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. Responses due by 1/25/2024. (Smith, Abraham) (answer)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION Emergency Joint Motion by all Defendants to Set Status Conference on Juris-diction and to Extend Deadline to Respond To First Amended Complaint by Defendants GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. Responses due by 1/25/2024. (Smith, Abraham) (misc) (answer)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Abraham)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Abraham G. Smith on behalf of Defendant Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP. (Smith, Abraham)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Amended Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Geico to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. GEICO Choice Insurance Company answer due by 1/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 Amended STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for GEICO to Respond to The First Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan) (extend) (answer)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2024. Pending before the Court is the parties' stipulation to extend deadline for Defendant Geico to respond to the first amended complaint. Docket No. 9. The stipulation is duplicative of Defendant Geico's prior motion to extend, which the Court denied. See Docket Nos. 8, 10. Accordingly, the parties' stipulation is DENIED without prejudice.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLP)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying #8 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant fails to provide a reason, as required by the Local Rules, for the request. Accordingly, Defendant's #8 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for GEICO to Respond to The First Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan) (extend) (answer)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/23/2024. (Carlson, Jonathan) (answer)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Choice Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Choice Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #2 Certificate of Interested Parties. ERROR: Interested Parties not added by attorney when filed. Notice entered to refile. (no image attached) (HAM)
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Cary B. Lerman, Joseph N. Glynn, Jacob Max Rosen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/19/2024. (no image attached) (AMMi)
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/5/2024. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/20/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
January 4, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Choice Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 ERROR: Interested Parties not added by attorney when filed. Notice entered to refile. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Choice Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Choice Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan) Modified on 1/5/2024 (HAM).
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-23-875800-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7543076) by GEICO Choice Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan W. Carlson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthams v. GEICO Choice Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Worthams
Represented By: Aneta Mackovski
Represented By: Jerome R. Bowen
Represented By: Jeffrey W Chronister
Represented By: Jerome R Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Mandy Vogel
Represented By: Cary B. Lerman
Represented By: Jacob Max Rosen
Represented By: Joseph N. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Roca Rothgerber, Christie, LLP
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?