Hedgepeth v. Meiborg Bros, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hedgepeth
Defendant: MEIBORG BROS, INC., Meiborg, Inc. doing business as Silver Arrow Express and James Ray Cox
Case Number: 2:2024cv00045
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to remove attorney Melissa J. Roose from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendants James Ray Cox, Meiborg Bros, Inc., Meiborg, Inc.. (Roose, Melissa)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #11 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Tiffany Hedgepeth. (Brown, Andrew)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying ECF No. #9 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 2/21/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tiffany Hedgepeth.. (Brown, Andrew)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants James Ray Cox, Meiborg Bros, Inc., Meiborg, Inc.. Replies due by 2/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Thompson, Robert)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Tiffany Hedgepeth. Responses due by 2/19/2024. (Brown, Andrew)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants James Ray Cox, Meiborg Bros, Inc., Meiborg, Inc... (Thompson, Robert)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Meiborg Bros, Inc., Meiborg, Inc... (Roose, Melissa)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:24-cv-00045-CDS-MDC. (no image attached) (AF)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/5/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/20/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (CAH)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Ray Cox, MEIBORG BROS, INC., Meiborg, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Meiborg Companies, Inc. for MEIBORG BROS, INC., Meiborg, Inc. added. Other Affiliate Silver Arrow Express for Meiborg, Inc. added. (Roose, Melissa) Modified to add Other Affiliate on 1/9/2024 (CJS).
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-23-882716-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7544340) by James Ray Cox, Meiborg, Inc., MEIBORG BROS, INC.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Roose, Melissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedgepeth v. Meiborg Bros, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hedgepeth
Represented By: Angela Marie Lee
Represented By: Dennis Michael Prince
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEIBORG BROS, INC.
Represented By: Robert Lance Thompson
Represented By: Melissa J Roose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meiborg, Inc. doing business as Silver Arrow Express
Represented By: Melissa J Roose
Represented By: Robert Lance Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ray Cox
Represented By: Robert Lance Thompson
Represented By: Melissa J Roose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?