Pearson v. Rock Gate Capital, LLC DBA 160 Driving Academy
Plaintiff: Shayna Pearson
Defendant: Rock Gate Capital, LLC DBA 160 Driving Academy and Rock Gate Capital, LLC doing business as 160 Driving Academy
Case Number: 2:2024cv00133
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by All Defendants. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/28/2024.(Hackett, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 3/14/2024. I defer ruling on Matthew T. Deffebach and Dominique Baldwin's verified petitions to practice pro hac vice. ECF Nos. #11 , #12 . The petitions indicate that defendant 160 Driving Academy appoints Stephen Hackett as its designated resident Nevada counsel in this case, but fail to provide the name, title, or signature of a representative of 160 Driving Academy; instead providing the petitioning attorneys' signatures.There is an additional deficiency in Baldwin's petition that must be addressed. ECF No. #12 . Counsel failed to attach the required "certification issued within six months before the date of filing of the verified petition [showing] that the applicant's membership is in good standing from the state bar or from the clerk of court of the supreme court or highest admitting court of every state, territory, or insular possession of the United States in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law." LR IA 11-2(b)(3). Counsel provided a certificate of good standing from Texas, but the petitioner is also admitted in New Mexico.Counsel are advised to correct the aforementioned deficiencies on amended petitions, and to file them using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event to link it to the existing filings. Failure to do so by March 28, 2024 will result in my denial of the verified petitions.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dominique Baldwin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Stephen R. Hackett, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7611631) by Defendant Rock Gate Capital, LLC. (Hackett, Stephen)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew T. Deffebach and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Stephen R. Hackett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7611602) by Defendant Rock Gate Capital, LLC. (Hackett, Stephen)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (CT)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for Referral for an Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to LR 16-5 and LR 16-6. Rock Gate Capital, LLC answer due 3/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 2/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for Referral for an Early Neutral Evaluation Pursuant to LR 16-5 and LR 16-6 by Defendant Rock Gate Capital, LLC. (Hackett, Stephen) (extend) (answer)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rock Gate Capital, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hackett, Stephen)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen R. Hackett on behalf of Defendant Rock Gate Capital, LLC. dba 160 Driving Academy (Hackett, Stephen)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shayna Pearson re #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Proof of Service)(Arata, Michael)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rock Gate Capital, LLC re #1 Complaint. (CT)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (CT)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shayna Pearson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Arata, Michael)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rock Gate Capital, LLC DBA 160 Driving Academy (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7558431) by Shayna Pearson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/28/2024. Proof of service due by 4/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Arata, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Rock Gate Capital, LLC DBA 160 Driving Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayna Pearson
Represented By: Michael Arata
Represented By: Michael A. Arata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Gate Capital, LLC DBA 160 Driving Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Gate Capital, LLC doing business as 160 Driving Academy
Represented By: Stephen R. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?