Thurmond v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Plaintiff: Edwan S Thurmond
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Case Number: 2:2024cv00252
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/5/2024. Re: #31 Proposed Discovery Plan. Defendant has not signed Plaintiff's proposed plan and Plaintiff has not provided any indication that Defendant agrees to it. The Court DENIES the proposed discovery plan because, under Nevada Local Rule 26-1(a) discovery plans must be stipulated, meaning that all parties agree to and have signed the plan. See LR 26-1(a) ("the parties must submit a stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order"). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the discovery plan (ECF No. #31 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer (as defined in Nevada Local Rule LR IA 1-3(f)) and submit a stipulated plan on or before April 26, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
April 5, 2024 Filing 31 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Edwan S Thurmond. (Thurmond, Edwan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #27 Response by Plaintiff Edwan S Thurmond. (Thurmond, Edwan)
April 4, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2024. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #14 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
April 4, 2024 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #25 Motion. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #25 as a RESPONSE and link it to the Motion it is responding, to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (KMB)
April 3, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #25 Motion to Amend/Correct,, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. Replies due by 4/10/2024. (Wraight, Mark)
March 28, 2024 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Wraight, Mark)
March 21, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend #14 Motion to Dismiss, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Edwan S Thurmond. Responses due by 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A for Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Thurmond, Edwan) (answer)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER approving ECF Nos. #16 , #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marquis I. Wraight for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving ECF Nos. #17 , #19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin J. Howard for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
March 13, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ayers, Michael)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s #15 Certificate of interested parties is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to file a proper certificate of interested parties by 3/29/2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 13, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Marquis I. Wraight, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Ayers, Michael)
March 13, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Benjamin J. Howard, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Ayers, Michael)
March 13, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2024. Re: #17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, Verified Petitions do not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). Client signatures are missing from the Petitions. Counsel is advised to remedy the deficiencies and refile Petitions under event Notice of Corrected Image linking to #16 and #17 by 4/10/2024. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petitions. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 See #19 Notice Corrected Image MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin J. Howard and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7614913) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Ayers, Michael)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 See #20 Notice of Corrected Image MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marquis I. Wraight and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7614690) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Ayers, Michael)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 STRICKEN per #21 Order (JQC) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ayers, Michael) Modified on 3/13/2024 (JQC).
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. Responses due by 3/26/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/22/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/26/2024. (Ayers, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 5, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edwan S Thurmond. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (KMB)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Edwan Thurmond's certificate of interested parties (ECF No. #11 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff to file a proper certificate of interested parties by March 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 STRICKEN per #12 Order (ALZ) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edwan S Thurmond. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (ALZ) Modified on 3/4/2024 (ALZ).
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Edwan S Thurmond. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/6/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. See PDF Order for additional specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/22/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwan S Thurmond re #3 Summons Issued. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., served on 2/22/2024. (ALZ)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Edwan S Thurmond. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/27/2024. (no image attached) (HAM)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiff Edwan S Thurmond. Responses due by 2/29/2024. (RJDG)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (RJDG)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re #1 Complaint. (RJDG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Edwan S Thurmond. (RJDG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Filing fee $405 - Paid) by Edwan S Thurmond. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/16/2024. Proof of service due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt (#2-7840)) (RJDG)
February 6, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurmond v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwan S Thurmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Represented By: Benjamin J. Howard
Represented By: Marquis I. Wraight
Represented By: Mark I. Wraight
Represented By: Michael R. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?