Nubia National Trust Bank v. HOA Collections LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nubia National Trust Bank
Defendant: HOA Collections LLC and Springs at Eldorado II Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2024cv00487
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying without prejudice #13 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Nubia National Trust Bank is given through and including May 25, 2024 to retain counsel who must appear by or before that date on behalf of the entity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERD that Nubia National Trust Bank may refile a motion to amend once counsel appears on behalf of the entity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Nubia National Trust Bank fails to retain counsel or if a plaintiff who may proceed pro se is not part of this action by or before May 25, 2024, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/18/2024 4/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) Modified signed on date to match Order on 4/25/2024 (CJS).
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Nubia National Trust Bank. Responses due by 4/29/2024. (ALZ)
April 10, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nubia National Trust Bank. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (CT)
April 10, 2024 Filing 11 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Nubia National Trust Bank. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/17/2024. (no image attached) (CJS)
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Nubia National Trust Bank. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2024. (no image attached) (CJS)
March 25, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Nubia National Trust Bank.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/1/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 14, 2024 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by 4/15/2024, counsel for plaintiff Nubia National Trust Bank must file an appearance to represent Nubia in this action. If counsel fails to make an appearance by that date, I will dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
March 12, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOA Collections LLC, Springs at Eldorado II Homeowners Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CAH)
March 12, 2024 Filing 3 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Nubia National Trust Bank. (CAH)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 405, receipt number 200008360 (CAH) Modified on 3/27/2024 - Payment returned (CJS).
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOA Collections LLC, Springs at Eldorado II Homeowners Association (Filing fee $405 - PAID) by Nubia National Trust Bank. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/23/2024. Proof of service due by 6/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CAH)
March 12, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RJDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nubia National Trust Bank v. HOA Collections LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubia National Trust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOA Collections LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springs at Eldorado II Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?