Republican National Committee et al v. Aguilar et al
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party and Scott Johnston
Defendant: Francisco Aguilar, Lorena Portillo, Hoen Scott William, Amy Burgans, Staci Lindberg, Jim Hindle and William Scott Hoen
Intervenor: Rise Action Fund, Institute for a Progressive Nevada and Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans
Amicus Curiae: ACLU of Nevada and Democratic National Committee
Case Number: 2:2024cv00518
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 20507 Administration of Voter Registration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 59 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #37 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #55 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, for attorney Jeffrey F. Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2024 Filing 58 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #53 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #36 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeffrey F. Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2024 Filing 57 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #53 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #35 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeffrey F. Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2024 Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/15/2024. Thomas McCarthy, Gilbert Dickey, and Conor Woodfin filed corrected images of their petitions to practice pro hac vice. ECF Nos. #53 ; #54 ; #55 . However, the petitions are still deficient. First, counsel failed to provide the signature of designated resident Nevada counsel Jeffrey Barr on page 5 of the petitions. Second, the petitions also fail to include the signature and bar number of Sigal Chattah as designated resident Nevada counsel for the Nevada Republican Party. Counsel are again instructed to correct these deficiencies on amended petitions, and to file them using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to do so by May 20, 2024 may result in denial of the verified petitions.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
May 14, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #37 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeffrey F. Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2024 Filing 54 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #36 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeff, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2024 Filing 53 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #35 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeffrey F Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2024 Filing 52 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #35 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeffrey F Barr, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2024 Filing 51 NOTICE Notice Filed Pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-1(b)(2) by Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund. (Schrager, Bradley)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting #46 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aseem Mulji for ACLU of Nevada and approving Designation of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/8/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 8, 2024 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/8/2024. I again defer ruling on the petitions to practice pro hac vice by Thomas McCarthy, Gilbert Dickey, and Conor Woodfin. ECF Nos. #35 ; #36 ; #37 . In their original petitions, counsel failed to provide the name, title, or signature of a representative of the Nevada Republican Party. ECF No. 33. Counsel has renewed their petitions to include that the Nevada Republican Party appoints Sigal Chattah as its designated resident Nevada counsel in this case. Ms. Chattah also signs as the representative of the Nevada Republican Party. ECF Nos. #35 at 7; #36 at 7; #37 at 7. In essence, Ms. Chattah is retaining herself as counsel. Counsel is advised to either obtain the signature of an alternate representative of the Nevada Republican Party who may appoint Ms. Chattah its designated resident counsel or provide the court with some authority which permits Ms. Chattah to retain herself as counsel. Failure to provide a corrected image or related case law by May 20, 2024 may result in my denial of the petitions.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting #44 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margo S. Jasukaitis for Democratic National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/8/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton for Democratic National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/8/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 6, 2024 Filing 46 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aseem Mulji and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7676284) by Amicus ACLU of Nevada. (Ramic, Sadmira)
May 6, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Amicus Democratic National Committee. Responses due by 5/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Daniel) (dispositive)
May 6, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Margo S. Jasukaitis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7674942) by Amicus Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Hamilton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7674927) by Amicus Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 3, 2024 Filing 42 First MOTION for Leave to File Document by Amicus ACLU of Nevada. Responses due by 5/17/2024. (Ramic, Sadmira) (dispositive)
April 29, 2024 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Nevada Republican Party. Replies due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2024 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Republican National Committee. Replies due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #34 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #26 Motion to Dismiss, #21 Motion to Dismiss. Based on the parties' stipulation, the deadline for the filing of any motion for leave to file an amicus briefs and such briefs is extended to May 6, 2024. The parties also agree to extend the deadline for plaintiffs to file their oppositions to the motions to dismiss and any response to the amicus briefs until May 8, 2024; and the deadline to file replies in support of the motions to dismiss until May 20, 2024. Motions due by 5/6/2024. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
April 29, 2024 Filing 38 JOINDER to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Amy Burgans. (Gregory, Cynthea)
April 29, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Conor D. Woodfin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7667151) by Plaintiff Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert C. Dickey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7667140) by Plaintiff Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7667105) by Plaintiff Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2024 Filing 34 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order Relating to Motions to Dismiss and Set Briefing Schedule re #30 Joinder, #27 Joinder, #31 Joinder, #28 Joinder, #21 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Francisco Aguilar. (St-Jules, Laena) (extend) (dispositive)
April 24, 2024 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/24/2024. On April 8, 2024, I deferred ruling on the verified petitions to practice pro hac vice by Thomas McCarthy, Gilbert Dickey, and Conor Woodfin because they did not comply with the designation of local counsel requirement. ECF No. 19. Counsel was given until April 18 to file a corrected image providing the name, title, and signature of a representative of the Nevada Republican Party. Id. To date, no corrected images are filed. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the verified petitions (ECF Nos. #13 ; #14 ; and #15 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should petitioners re-apply, they will be required to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
April 22, 2024 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. Amy Burgans served on 4/16/2024. (Chattah, Sigal)
April 22, 2024 Filing 31 JOINDER to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Jim Hindle. (Parks, Katherine)
April 19, 2024 Filing 30 JOINDER to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Staci Lindberg. (Rye, Stephen)
April 18, 2024 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #28 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
April 18, 2024 Filing 28 JOINDER to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant William Scott Hoen. (Woodbury, Jason)
April 15, 2024 Filing 27 JOINDER to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Lorena Portillo. (Logsdon, Lisa)
April 15, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Francisco Aguilar. Responses due by 4/29/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/25/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2024. (St-Jules, Laena) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 15, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. Staci Lindberg served on 4/1/2024. (Chattah, Sigal)
April 15, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. William Scott Hoen served on 3/28/2024. (Chattah, Sigal)
April 15, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. Lorena Portillo served on 3/25/2024. (Chattah, Sigal)
April 15, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. Francisco Aguilar served on 3/28/2024. (Chattah, Sigal)
April 15, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendants Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund. Responses due by 4/29/2024. (Schrager, Bradley)
April 11, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Intervene, by Intervenor Defendants Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund. (Schrager, Bradley)
April 8, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/8/2024. I defer ruling on the petitions to practice pro hac vice by Thomas McCarthy, Gilbert Dickey, and Conor Woodfin. ECF Nos. #13 ; #14 ; #15 . The petitioners indicate that they have been retained by "the Republican National Committee, et al." ECF Nos. #13 at 1; #14 at 1; #15 at 1. However, the appointment of designated resident Nevada counsel in this case fails to provide the name, title, or signature of a representative of the Nevada Republican Party. ECF Nos. #13 at 4-5; #14 at 4-5; #15 at 4-5. Counsel is advised to correct the aforementioned deficiency on an amended petition, and to file it using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event to link it to the existing filing. Failure to do so by April 18, 2024 may result in denial of the verified petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
April 4, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Intervene, by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Replies due by 4/11/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Christopher D. Dodge for Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/4/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Marisa A. O'Gara for Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/4/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Conor Woodfin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7637685) by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert C Dickey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7637684) by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7637683) by Plaintiffs Scott Johnston, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marisa A. O'Gara and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7636628) by Intervenor Defendants Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund. (Schrager, Bradley)
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Dodge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7636552) by Intervenor Defendants Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Rise Action Fund. (Schrager, Bradley)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
March 22, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Marisa A. O'Gara to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/5/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher D. Dodge to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/5/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 21, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Rise Action Fund, Institute for a Progressive Nevada, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans. Responses due by 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Christian Solomon, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Shelbie Swartz, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Thomas Bird)(Fox, David)
March 19, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francisco Aguilar, Amy Burgans, Jim Hindle, William Scott Hoen, Staci Lindberg, Lorena Portillo re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (AMMi)
March 18, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (AMMi)
March 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Conor D. Woodfin to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/1/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gilbert C. Dickey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/1/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas R. McCarthy to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/1/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scott Johnston, Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barr, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7620339) by Scott Johnston, Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/28/2024. Proof of service due by 6/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (Barr, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/18/2024 (WJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republican National Committee et al v. Aguilar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Republican Party
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnston
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Aguilar
Represented By: Laena St-Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Portillo
Represented By: Lisa Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoen Scott William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Burgans
Represented By: Cynthea Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci Lindberg
Represented By: Stephen B Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hindle
Represented By: Katherine F. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Hoen
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Johnson
Represented By: Jason D. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rise Action Fund
Represented By: Marisa A. O'Gara
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Christoper D. Dodge
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Institute for a Progressive Nevada
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Marisa A. O'Gara
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Marisa A. O'Gara
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACLU of Nevada
Represented By: Aseem Mulji
Represented By: Sadmira Ramic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Daniel Henry Stewart
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Margo S. Jasukaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?