Sunshine v. Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC
Plaintiff: Angela Sunshine
Defendant: Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00558
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/28/2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/7/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC. (Montet, Jordan)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Hua Li, #2 Exhibit Payroll Documents, #3 Exhibit Pay Stubs, #4 Exhibit Urgent Care Records, #5 Exhibit Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit Worker's Compensation Application)(Montet, Jordan)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Angela Sunshine. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Burke, Steven)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/2024. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/6/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/21/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
March 21, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Montet, Jordan)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-884887-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7625480) by Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Montet, Jordan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunshine v. Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Sunshine
Represented By: Steven H. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funxional Behavior Analysis LLC
Represented By: Jordan Montet
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?