Polk v. The State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Polk
Defendant: The State of Nevada, The Supreme Court of the State of Nevada, The Nevada Board of Bar Examiners, State Bar of Nevada, Board of Governors of the State Bar and The Nevada Commissioner of Insurance
Case Number: 2:2024cv00625
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by Plaintiff Geoffrey Polk. (CAH)
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by Plaintiff Geoffrey Polk. (CAH)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geoffrey Polk. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (RJDG)
April 12, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Geoffrey Polk. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/19/2024. (no image attached) (HAM)
April 2, 2024 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Governors of the State Bar, State Bar of Nevada, The Nevada Board of Bar Examiners, The Nevada Commissioner of Insurance, The State of Nevada, The Supreme Court of the State of Nevada re #1 Complaint. (CAH)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 405, receipt number 200008606 (CAH)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Governors of the State Bar, State Bar of Nevada, The Nevada Board of Bar Examiners, The Nevada Commissioner of Insurance, The State of Nevada, The Supreme Court of the State of Nevada (Filing fee $405 - PAID) by Geoffrey Polk. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/12/2024. Proof of service due by 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CAH)
March 29, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. The State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Supreme Court of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nevada Board of Bar Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors of the State Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nevada Commissioner of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?