Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Acuity Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Acuity Insurance, Royal Refrigeration, Inc. and Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00684
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Royal Refrigeration, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ballin, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2024 STRIKING Defendants' CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. Defendants' certificate of interested parties #11 violates FRCP 7.1, which requires that all parties in a diversity-jurisdiction case like this one identify the citizenship of "every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). The certificate of interested parties for Acuity Insurance and Royal Refrigeration, Inc. is silent about these entities' citizenship. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendants' certificate of interested parties #11 is STRUCK, and they have five days to file a new certificate that complies with FRCP 7.1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
May 29, 2024 Filing 11 STRICKEN per 12 Minute Order (JQC) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Guelker, Gary) Modified on 6/5/2024 (JQC).
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by All Defendants.(Guelker, Gary)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Royal Refrigeration, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ballin, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Royal Refrigeration, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/30/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/4/2024.(Ballin, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #4 Amended Complaint,. Royal Refrigeration, Inc. served on 5/1/2024. (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company on 4/30/2024 executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company, Royal Refrigeration, Inc. re #4 Amended Complaint. (RJDG)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Summons Amended Summons - Acuity, #8 Summons Amended Summons - Royal Refrigeration) (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acuity Insurance, Royal Refrigeration, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (RJDG)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company added. (Carlson, Jonathan)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7645422) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/18/2024. Proof of service due by 7/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Acuity Insurance, #9 Summons Royal Refrigeration, Inc.) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 8, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RJDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Acuity Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Pamela L. McGaha
Represented By: Sean E. Cortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity Insurance
Represented By: Gary R Guelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Refrigeration, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Ballin
Represented By: Gary R Guelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary R Guelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?