Sylve v. Uyematsu et al
Plaintiff: Cheyanne Sylve and Tristan Hill
Defendant: Carly Rose Uyematsu, Samuel Ramirez and Samuel Espinosa Ramirez
Cross Defendant: Sarah Ashley Sharples
Case Number: 2:2024cv00716
Filed: April 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Third Party Plaintiffs Samuel Espinosa Ramirez, Carly Rose Uyematsu, Defendants Samuel Espinosa Ramirez, Carly Rose Uyematsu. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tristan Hill, Cheyanne Sylve. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lafia, Michael)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carly Rose Uyematsu. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (O'Briant, Priscilla)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #2 using the appropriate docket entry event of Certificate Interested Parties. (no image attached) (CJS)
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/15/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
April 12, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MAM)
April 12, 2024 Filing 2 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Carly Rose Uyematsu. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
April 12, 2024 Filing 1 Joint PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-882867-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7651194) by Carly Rose Uyematsu, Samuel Ramirez. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Briant, Priscilla) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylve v. Uyematsu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyanne Sylve
Represented By: Michael Christopher Lafia
Represented By: Steve Dimopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Hill
Represented By: Michael Christopher Lafia
Represented By: Steve Dimopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carly Rose Uyematsu
Represented By: Nicholas Fredrick Psyk
Represented By: Priscilla L. O'Briant
Represented By: Eran S Forster
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Scott H. Barbag
Represented By: Shayne L. Wulterin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Ramirez
Represented By: Eran S Forster
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Scott H. Barbag
Represented By: Shayne L. Wulterin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Espinosa Ramirez
Represented By: Eran S Forster
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Scott H. Barbag
Represented By: Shayne L. Wulterin
Represented By: Priscilla L. O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Sarah Ashley Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?