Broyles v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dorthy Broyles
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00784
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ALZ)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/8/2024. Motions due by 12/9/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/13/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
June 11, 2024 Filing 7 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Dorthy Broyles. (Moynihan, Ross)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/28/2024. Re: #5 Discovery Plan. The parties' discovery plan seeks a longer discovery period than that contemplated by Local Rule 26-1(b) but does not provide a "statement of reasons why longer or different time periods should apply," as required by Local Rule 26-1(a). The Court thus DENIES the discovery plan without prejudice. The parties must file a renewed discovery plan on or before June 11, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
May 24, 2024 Filing 5 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Dorthy Broyles. (Moynihan, Ross)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McAffee, Alisa)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/24/2024. By Deputy Clerk: R. Gador. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/9/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/24/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
April 23, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RJDG)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (McAffee, Alisa)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-8868981-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7662169) by Walmart, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Declaration, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (McAffee, Alisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broyles v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorthy Broyles
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa A. McAffee
Represented By: Tabetha Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?