Bushar v. Albertsons, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Bushar
Defendant: Albertsons, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00804
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the defendant Albertsons, LLC has until July 1, 2024, to file its amended answer and its third-party complaint. Albertsons, LLC answer due 7/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 6/24/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 6/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Albertsons, LLC. (Brandon, Lewis)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (GA) (GA).
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 STIPULATION Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/24/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/23/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 5/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Albertsons, LLC. (Smerber, Justin) (other) (discovery)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Albertsons, LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2024. (Smerber, Justin) (answer)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertsons, LLC. (Brandon, Lewis)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/29/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
April 26, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (MAM)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertsons, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brandon, Lewis)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-885242-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7666509) by Albertsons, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brandon, Lewis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushar v. Albertsons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bushar
Represented By: Michael T Nixon
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons, LLC
Represented By: Justin W. Smerber
Represented By: Kristen Ann Molloy
Represented By: Lewis W. Brandon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?