Gonzales v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: Raul Gonzales
Respondent: Warden William Gittere and The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2024cv00816
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case by Petitioner Raul Gonzales. Responses due by 7/9/2024. (Kirschner, C.)
June 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Johnson on behalf of Respondents William Gittere, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada. (Johnson, Matthew)
June 21, 2024 Attorney update in case: Attorney Aaron D. Ford-AG withdrawn from the case. (Johnson, Matthew)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Federal Public Defender, through C.B. Kirschner, Esq., is appointed as counsel for Petitioner Raul Gonzalez in all federal proceedings related to this matter, including any appeals or certiorari proceedings, unless allowed to withdraw. Petitioner has 90 days from entry of this order to file an amended petition or seek other appropriate relief. This deadline and any extension thereof may not be construed as implied findings regarding the federal limitation period or a basis for tolling. Petitioner at all times remains responsible for calculating the running of the federal limitation period and timely asserting claims, without regard to any court-ordered deadlines or extensions. Thus, a petition or amended petition filed within a court-ordered deadline may still be dismissed as untimely if it violates the statute of limitations. The respondents must file a response to the amended petition, including potentially by motion to dismiss, within 60 days of service of an amended petition. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days of service of the answer. However, Local Rule LR 7-2(b) governs the response and reply time to any motion filed by either party, including motions filed in lieu of a pleading. See Order for additional information. Amended Petition due by 9/16/2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
June 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney C. B. Kirschner on behalf of Petitioner Raul Gonzales. (Kirschner, C.)
June 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to ADD Gonzalez v. Gittere, Case No. 2:21-cv-2055-GMN-DJA, as a related case on the docket of this matter. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed as counsel and will have until June 28, 2024, to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate the offices inability to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to ADD Aaron D. Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents and provide the respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the notice of electronic filing to the Office of the AG only. Respondents' counsel must enter a notice of appearance within 21 days of entry of this order. The Clerk of Court is further directed to SEND a copy of this order to the pro se petitioner, the Nevada Attorney General, the Federal Public Defender, and the CJA Coordinator for this division. The Clerk will further provide the Federal Public Defender with copies of all prior filings in this case by regenerating notices of electronic filing. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/2/2024. (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: AFP/CJA - ALZ)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Motion to Appoint Federal Public Defender as Counsel by Petitioner Raul Gonzales. (Kirschner, C.)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Warden William Gittere, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:24-cv-00816-JAD-EJY. (For Distribution by law library.) (CAH)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number 200009065 (CAH)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 - PAID) by Raul Gonzales. (CAH)
April 29, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ALZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Gonzales
Represented By: Law Library - Ely State Prison
Represented By: C. B. Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden William Gittere
Represented By: Matthew S Johnson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Matthew S Johnson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?