Hill v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: JoAquin Hill
Defendant: Rigney, Nevada Department of Corrections, Drummond, Ely State Prison, State of Nevada, Pickens, William Gittere and Snow
Case Number: 2:2024cv00923
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff JoAquin Hill. (DLS)
June 27, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE re duplicate cases by JoAquin Hill. (DLS)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #1 is denied without prejudice. It is further ordered that Plaintiff has until August 5, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents: (1) a completed application with the inmate's two signatures on page 3, (2) a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official, and (3) a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff JoAquin Hill the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint ECF No. #1 -1 but not file it at this time. The Clerk of the Court is directed to resend Plaintiff JoAquin Hill a copy of its advisory letter ECF No. #2 . (Emailed on 6/4/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/4/2024. (For Distribution by law library.) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2024: #2 Copy of Advisory Letter ECF No. 2) (GA).
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Offender is not at HDSP) re #1 , #2 addressed to JoAquin Hill. (Attachments: #1 Mail Returned, #2 Mail Returned) (GA)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (For Distribution by law library.) (GA)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff JoAquin Hill. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to file Brief)(GA)
May 16, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (GA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ely State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAquin Hill
Represented By: Law Library - High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?