Villamor v. Metcalfe et al
Plaintiff: Chadwick Fabian Villamor
Defendant: Officer D. Ketring, Detective R. Gillum, Adam Solinger, Officer A. Bookman and Officer J. Metcalfe
Case Number: 2:2024cv00940
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 8 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 82.76, receipt number 2000010114. (CAH)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: ORDER granting #6 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay an initial installment fee in the amount of $82.76 toward the full filing fee of $350. Plaintiff shall have the designated fee sent to the Clerks Office no later than July 17, 2024. The Clerk's Office shall provide Plaintiff with two copies of this Order.The Clerks Office shall send a copy of this Order to the attention of the inmate accounts department at Clark County Detention Center, 3330 South Casino Center Boulevard, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. The Clerks Office shall provide a copy of this Order to the Finance Division of theClerks Office.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance/CCDC Accounts Dept - 2 copies mailed to P - ALZ)
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chadwick Fabian Villamor. (CAH)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff shall either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, including an inmate account statement for the past six months and a properly executed financial certificate. The Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. Plaintiff must comply with this order no later than July 3, 2024. Failure to comply will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc Approved Form Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis to Defendant - CAH)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:24-cv-00940-APG-NJK. (no image attached) (KMB)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/20/2024. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MAM)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (MAM)
May 17, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villamor v. Metcalfe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer D. Ketring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective R. Gillum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Solinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer A. Bookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Metcalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Fabian Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?