Sub-file of A-3-LDG Re: Petition to Modify or Amend Final Decree
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Nevada State Engineer and Kitty P. Rose
Petitioner: Fallon, City Of
Respondent: Lake Ditch Company, Sharon Winder Avery, Ann Rosevear, Katharine G Hale, Nick Garro, Kenneth E. Riedinger, Nathan A Farley, Earl D Dushane, Virginia Fowler, David Stix, Roger G. Hyytinen, Chad M. Larkin, Darla McKenna, Douglas B. Clary, Maxwell R Brassfield, Phyllis M Miller, Deborah R. Knuttila, Anne M. Vohl, Michael Lynn Lakin, Charmaine F. Christie, Roger Kunzler, Kathryn Hicks, Marijeanne Reno, Clifford Reynolds, Mark Hammond, Joyce Irene Betts, Steigerwald Living Trust, Craig S. Penner, Meredith Hennessey, John R Goodnight, H T Cafferata, Hammond & Hammond Rental Prop., Eric John & Dianna Olsen, Patricia Moore, Milton H. Lees, Donna J. Barton, Thomas A. Vallas, Michael B. Bussio, HWA D. Brodhead, Vicky Zubieta, Jesse Hernandez, Tahoe-Reno Industrial Center, Ronald C. Kirk, Ruth Ripsom, Elaine S. Sutherland, Harrah's Operating Co., Juarez Adams, David Emmil, Robert L. Condie, Carol McCracken, Roberta Shurtliff, William A. Swager, Perazzo LLC, John T. Cimino, Louis Gomes Family Trust, Abacus Nevada LP, John Torvik, Meyer Enterprise Inc, Bear Creek Cabin, LLC, Russell E Miller, Kenneth M. Willaman, Gary J. Heser, Diana O. Parham, Ray Lavoie, Shirley S. Mayer, Shana Fearnley, Lee Dorsey, Trustee Dorsey Loving Trust, Jean M Workman, Jeffrey Haisfield, Dan Dillard, Nevada Tri Partners, Aaron Farley, April M Edelstein, Theron J. Hall, William Candee, Louis Mori, Barbara A. Hyytinen, Linda K Rhodes Facque, Dennis Serdehely, Garry Gadbois, Linda A. Bowman, Santor Trust, Ray Peterson, William H Wood, II, Hendrix Ranch NV Partnership, Garth Young, Keith G. Schmidt, Jarold B. Sorensen, Richard Allegre, George V Forbes, Larry F Miller, Carmen Bell, Gladys T. Dieckmann, Charlie Knittle, Red Hawk Land Company, Cheryl Fogarty, Calvin R & Candace J Moffitt, FH Ranch, LLC, Patricia A. Stephens, Gary Bacock, Bruce A Ericson, James Sustacha, Steven Biddinger, Kirsten Kos, Dennis C. Davids, G F Edgmon, Shyrle Myers, John R. Mincer, Sam Hiibel, Vickie J. Martinson, William G. Henry, Andrew M. Scholz, Katherine A. Ralston, Kathleen Juarez, Frank B Monroe, Jr., E.C. & Cynthia Kaufer, City of Sparks, Jill Ross, Guy A Fowler, Bonnie J. Rose, Shirley J. Siri, Paiute-Shoshone Tribe, Sandra T Goetze, Karen E. Harmon, Gregory J. Chavez, Barbara J. Manha, Kathleen Morser, Harold G & Rhonda L Johnson Trust, David G & Sylvia M Lumos, Daniel R Fagundes, Gloria J Fitch, Marcia L Ernst, Gail Laflame, Jennifer Hesselgesser, Martin T Siudzinski, Timothy R. Markley, Ferguson Family Trust, David Gilbert, Eric D Grimes, Alois Krauer, Elliott Vincent, Janice Kirk, Gary McCurry, William T. Jones, Orval F. Fowler, Jr., Wilbert J. Smith, Richard M. Rose, Barbara Reed, Ralph A. Manfredi, Robert A. Gardner, Dennis E. Ingalls, Emilie A. Varella, EBB LLC, Robert Baker, Triny J. Otero, Margaret Mansfield, Michael A. Laca, Dale K Groves, Larry & Ricci Buchard, Joyce Diegel, Lawrence H. Biral, Sunday Schwein, Eleni Papas, Rainer R. Schulz and Clarence C. Silva
Interested Party: Distribution Only
Case Number: 3:1973cv00031
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D George
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2016 Filing 1525 NOTICE Certificate of Mail Service by Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1524 Order on Mandate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mailing List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sample Post Card)(Springmeyer, Don)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER ON #1523 MANDATE. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/15/2016. USCA Case Nos. 14-17353 and 14-17368. (DRM)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1513 / #1516 Notices of Appeal USCA Case Nos. 14-17353 and 14-17368, dismissing appeals per stipulations. This order shall serve as and for the mandate. (JC)
August 27, 2015 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1522 Notice (Other), : add link to document #1521 that was served. Counsel picked the wrong entry for certificate of service. A notice is the wrong entry to use. Under Process of Service is where counsel can find certificate of service which will allow counsel to select the document that was served. (no image attached)(WJ)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1522 NOTICE Certificate Of Mail Service re #1521 by Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1521 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mailing List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Post Card)(Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 8/27/2015 add link to document being served. (WJ).
August 25, 2015 Filing 1521 NOTICE Joint Notice of Filing Re: Stipulation of Mandatory Signatory Parties to Truckee River Operating Agreement by United States Of America. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
December 30, 2014 Filing 1520 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION re #1516 Notice of Appeal,,,, #1400 Transcript,,. By Respondents, Edward R. and Brenda K. Alves; Phillip Amos; Burdette Revocable Trust, c/o Myron and Mary Burdette, Trustees; William J. and Sue J. Chambers; Milton W. Cohen; Cote Family 1995 Trust, c/o Louis and Carol Cote, Trustees; Gerald R. Edgmon; Daniel B. Franich; James Harper; Huber Family Trust, c/o Georgeen Pierre, Trustee; Joan Johnson; Marjorie Marvel-Barnes and Jody E. Barnes; Elbert L. and Marilyn Mills; Michael and Phyllis Peyerl; Pomeroy Family Trust, c/o Philip and Carla Pomeroy; Rambling River Ranches, c/o Norman W. Frey; Roberson Family Trust, c/o Leland and Wanda Roberson, Trustees; Sharon Ronnow; Santos Family Trust, c/o Raul Santos, Trustee; Marie Sherman; Skips Place, LLC, c/o Yvonne Prettyman, Member and Sidney Imeson, Member; David Stix; William and Gwen Washburn; Witte Family Trust, c/o Herman G. Witte, Trustee; Wolf Ranch I, c/o Daniel and Julie Wolf and Howard and Barbara Wolf. (Ure, Therese) Modified on 12/30/2014 to reflect filing party names. (BLG).
December 24, 2014 Filing 1519 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation District, Respondent Truckee-Carson Irrigation District re #1513 Notice of Appeal, #1400 Transcript,,. (Van Zandt, Michael)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER for Time Schedule and docketing letter as to #1516 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-17368 assigned. (KR)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1516 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1512 Order on Motion, filed by Respondents, Edward R. and Brenda K. Alves; Phillip Amos; Burdette Revocable Trust, c/o Myron and Mary Burdette, Trustees; William J. and Sue J. Chambers; Milton W. Cohen; Cote Family 1995 Trust, c/o Louis and Carol Cote, Trustees; Gerald R. Edgmon; Daniel B. Franich; James Harper; Huber Family Trust, c/o Georgeen Pierre, Trustee; Joan Johnson; Marjorie Marvel-Barnes and Jody E. Barnes; Elbert L. and Marilyn Mills; Michael and Phyllis Peyerl; Pomeroy Family Trust, c/o Philip and Carla Pomeroy; Rambling River Ranches, c/o Norman W. Frey; Roberson Family Trust, c/o Leland and Wanda Roberson, Trustees; Sharon Ronnow; Santos Family Trust, c/o Raul Santos, Trustee; Marie Sherman; Skips Place, LLC, c/o Yvonne Prettyman, Member and Sidney Imeson, Member; David Stix; William and Gwen Washburn; Witte Family Trust, c/o Herman G. Witte, Trustee; Wolf Ranch I, c/o Daniel and Julie Wolf and Howard and Barbara Wolf. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. **Clerk's Note: Appeal originally filed in 3:73-cv-3 (Doc. #1576) and filing fee paid at time of filing; appeal will be processed in this case (3:73-cv-00031). (JC)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 ORDER for Time Schedule and docketing letter as to #1513 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-17353 assigned. (KR) Modified on 12/1/2014 to correct link (KR).
November 25, 2014 Filing 1515 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number NVRNO-2586 re #1513 Notice of Appeal. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JC)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1514 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #1513 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JC)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1513 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1512 Order (1574 - 3:73-cv-3) filed by Truckee-Carson Irrigation District, Churchill County and City of Fallon; attorneys Michael J. Van Zandt, Nathan A. Metcalf, Benjamin Shawcroft, and Michael Mackedon. Filing fee $505 - not paid - attorney's office represented fee will be brought in. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JC)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER granting #1173 Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case in 1944; denying as moot #1510 Motion for Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1511 NOTICE Certificate of Mail Service by Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1510 MOTION Moving Parties Request to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case in 1944 (#1173). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mailing LIst, #2 Exhibit 2 - Post Card)(Springmeyer, Don)
January 14, 2014 Filing 1510 MOTION for Case Management Conference (Re: Petition to Modify or Amend Final Decree) Joint filing by Moving Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) and LR 16.1(d), the Truckee Meadows Water Authority, the Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Washoe County Water Conservation District, the City of Fernley, Nevada, the State of Nevada, the State of California acting by and through the California Department of Water Resources, and the United States of America (the Moving Parties), who are the Moving Parties with respect to the Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in This Case in 1944 (Doc. #1173) (Motion to Modify), through their undersigned attorneys, respectfully request that the Court schedule a case management conference in this matter at the earliest possible date.. filed by Petitioner Truckee Meadows Water Authority. (DePaoli, Gordan) Responses due by 1/31/2014. QC assisted filing - caused by access difficulty in CM/ECF Program.(BLG)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 ORDER granting #1496 Motion : Respondents Ken and Patty Julian are withdrawn and are no longer interested parties in this litigation. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 ORDER granting #1500 Motion : Respondent Holly Bute is withdrawn and no longer an interested party in this litigation. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 ORDERED that Schroeder Law Offices, P.C. shall be allowed to withdraw as attorney of record for Respondent Taylor A. Detomasi (ref. #1499 pdf) and that all further pleadings, motions, notices, and correspondence in this matter be mailed to Respondent at: 1305 S. Main Street, Fallon, NV 89406. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 8/19/2013 (DRM).
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER GRANTING #1501 Motion to Substitute Parties re Kathy Pawley and Laura Griffin as lawful successors to Respondent B. Lorraine Griffin Trust. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 8/19/2013 to add party names, and correct file date (DRM)
August 14, 2013 Filing 1505 NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff United States Of America. (McCune, Devon)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1504 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1496 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Parties from Litigation (Ken and Patty Julian), #1500 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Party from Litigation (Holly Bute), #1501 MOTION to Substitute Party , #1503 Proposed Order Submission, #1502 Affidavit, #1497 Affidavit, #1499 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , #1498 Proposed Order Submission by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1503 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1500 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Party from Litigation (Holly Bute) ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Ure, Therese)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1502 AFFIDAVIT of Therese A. Ure re #1500 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Party from Litigation (Holly Bute) ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Ure, Therese)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1501 MOTION to Substitute Party by Respondent David Stix. Responses due by 8/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Therese A. Ure in Support of Motion to Substitute Parties (B. Lorraine Griffin Trust), #2 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Parties)(Schroeder, Laura)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1500 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Party from Litigation (Holly Bute) by Respondent David Stix. Responses due by 8/30/2013. (Ure, Therese)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1499 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Respondent David Stix Taylor A. Detomasi . Motion ripe 8/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Therese A. Ure in Support of Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondent Pro Se, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondent Pro Se)(Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 8/19/2013 correct the name of the respondent. (WJ).
August 13, 2013 Filing 1498 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1496 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Parties from Litigation (Ken and Patty Julian) ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Ure, Therese)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1497 AFFIDAVIT of Therese A. Ure re #1496 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Parties from Litigation (Ken and Patty Julian) ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Ure, Therese)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1496 MOTION to Withdraw Interested Parties from Litigation (Ken and Patty Julian) by Respondent David Stix. Responses due by 8/30/2013. (Ure, Therese)
March 12, 2013 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1495 MOTION Direct Entry of Final Judgment : Counsel has informed Clerk's Office that this motion was mis-filed and should have been filed in 3:73-cv-3-LDG. Counsel has refiled said motion into the correct case 3:73-cv-3-LDG. (no image attached)(BLG)
March 11, 2013 Filing 1495 MOTION Direct Entry of Final Judgment by Respondent Fernley, Town of. Responses due by 3/28/2013. (Taggart, Paul) Modified on 3/12/2013 refiled correctly into 3:73-cv-3-LDG.(BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 1494 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE by Chad Blanchard, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Avis E. Andrulli re #1493 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Mailing Matrix, #2 Exhibit 2 Example of Post Card)(Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 3/6/2013 updated filing parties. (BLG).
February 19, 2013 Filing 1493 NOTICE Moving Parties' Notice of Recent Authority: California State Water Resources Control Board Order WR 2013-0009 by Chad Blanchard, Avis E. Andrulli, United States Of America re #1484 Reply Brief,. (Macfarlane, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2013 update to filing parties. (BLG).
November 29, 2012 Filing 1492 NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE by PLPTI re #1491 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 11/30/2012 remove non filing parties. (WJ).
November 20, 2012 Filing 1491 NOTICE Moving Parties' Notice of Recent Authority by USA California Department of Water Resources, Truckee Meadow Water Authority, PLPTI, Washoe County Water Conservation District and City of Fernley re #1484 Reply Brief,. (Macfarlane, Stephen) Modified on 11/21/2012 re move non filing parties. (WJ).
September 13, 2012 Filing 1490 RESPONSE to #1173 Petition to Modify Final Decree, filed by Clarence L. Shields.(JC)
August 21, 2012 Filing 1489 NOTICE by PLPTI re #1484 Reply Brief,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 8/22/2012 removed non filing parties. (WJ).
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 ORDER granting #1482 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1487 DECLARATION of Moving Parties' Certificate of Service of CD Of Supp. Rebuttal Exhibits by USA, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Truckee Meadows Water Authority, the Washoe County Water Conservation District, and the City of Fernley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/16/2012 removed non filing parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 1486 ERRATA Moving Parties' Errata to Supp. appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits filed USA, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Truckee Meadows Water Authority, the Washoe County Water Conservation District, and the City of Fernley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment C, #2 Exhibit Attachment D, #3 Exhibit Attachment G)(De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/14/2012 removed non filing parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 1485 NOTICE of Manual Filing by USA, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Truckee Meadows Water Authority, the Washoe County Water Conservation District, and the City of Fernley. Supp. Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits in CD format 1 CD filed with the Clerk's Office. Moving Parties' Notice of Manual Filing of Supplemental Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits in CD Format (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/14/2012 to remove non filing parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 1484 REPLY BRIEF Reply of Moving Parties in Support of Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in This Case in 1944 by USA, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Truckee Meadows Water Authority, the Washoe County Water Conservation District, and the City of Fernley. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/14/2012 remove non filer parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 1483 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by USA, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, the Truckee Meadows Water Authoirty the Washoe County Water Conservation District and the City of Fernley Re Moving Parties' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/14/2012 remove non filer parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 1482 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Moving Parties' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by USA, State of Nevada, State of California Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District and the City of Fernley. Motion ripe 8/13/2012. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/14/2012 remove non filing parties. (WJ).
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER GRANTING #1479 Motion to manually file in CD format the Supp. Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1480 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Truckee Meadows Water Authority Proposed Order Granting Leave to Manually File Supplemental Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits in CD Format RE: #1479 Motion. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/9/2012 to correct filing party & link to motion (AF).
August 9, 2012 Filing 1479 MOTION Leave to manually file Supp. Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits in CD format Moving Parties' Motion for Leave to Manually File Supplemental Appendix of Rebuttal Exhibits in CD Format and Points & Authorities thereon by Truckee Meadows Water Authority. Responses due by 8/26/2012. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 8/9/2012 to correct filing party (AF).
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 ORDER ON STIPULATION re #1477 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Replies. Replies to #1465 and #1469 Responses due by 8/13/2012. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 12, 2012 Filing 1477 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1469 Response to Motion,, #1465 Response to Motion, ; by Respondents City of Fernley, Truckee Meadows, Water Authority, PLPT, Washoe County Water Conservation District, State of Nevada, State of California, California Department of Water Resources, USA, (Taggart, Paul) Modified on 6/13/2012 re move non filers from the entry. (WJ).
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 ORDER granting #1467 Motion for Leave to File memorandum of points and authorities which exceeds 30 pages. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 5, 2012 Filing 1475 Joinder in #1465 and #1469 to petition #1173 obo Respondents Villacorta Living Trust, Bridgewater Family Trust, Crowley Living Trust and various other water users in the Newlands Project (Crowley Respondents) by Martin G Crowley. Replies due by 6/15/2012. (Crowley, Martin) Modified on 6/6/2012 to correct entry and add links to document and remove non filers from entry (WJ).
June 5, 2012 Filing 1474 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Churchill County, City of Fallon and Other Respondents' #1473 Joinder in TCIDs #1469 Opposition to the #1173 Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the 1944 Final Decree (docket numbers #1466 and #1473 ) by (Mingay, Craig) Modified on 6/5/2012 remove non filers. (WJ).
June 4, 2012 Filing 1473 JOINDER Churchill County's Joinder in TCID's #1469 Opposition to the #1173 Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the 1944 Final Decree filed by (Mingay, Craig) Modified on 6/5/2012 to remove unnecessary filers (WJ).
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 ORDER GRANTING #1455 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura A Schroeder withdrawn on behalf of Respondent George Hucke now appearing pro se. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 ORDER granting #1458 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Attorney Laura A. Schroeder withdrawn obo Respondents Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke now appearing pro se. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 ORDER granting #1461 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Attorney Laura A. Schroeder withdrawn obo Respondents David and Margo Jordan now appearing pro se. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1469 RESPONSE in Opposition to the #1173 Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the 1944 Final Decree by TCID. Replies due by 6/11/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-L, #3 Exhibit M-N, #4 Exhibit O-Y, #5 Exhibit Z, #6 Exhibit AA-FF, #7 Exhibit GG-RR, #8 Exhibit SS-XX, #9 Exhibit YY-AAA, #10 Exhibit BBB-1, #11 Exhibit BBB-2, #12 Exhibit BBB-3, #13 Exhibit BBB-4, #14 Exhibit CCC-GGG, #15 Exhibit HHH-KKK, #16 Exhibit LLL-QQQ)(Van Zandt, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2012 to correct link to proper motion and delink from wrong motion and remove all non filers from entry. (WJ).
June 1, 2012 Filing 1468 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by RespondentsTO Exceed Page Limit. re #1467 by TCID (Van Zandt, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2012 to remove non filers and to link to motion (WJ).
June 1, 2012 Filing 1467 MOTION for Leave to File To Exceed Page Limit by Respondents TCID. Motion ripe 6/1/2012. (Van Zandt, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2012 delete non filers from this entry. (WJ).
June 1, 2012 Filing 1466 JOINDER City of Fallon's, et al Joinder In Truckee Carson Irrigation District's #1469 Opposition to The #1173 Amended Motion To Modify Or Amend The 1944 Final Decree filed by City of Fallon (Mackedon, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2012 to remove non filing parties. (WJ). Modified on 6/4/2012 add link to amended motion. (WJ).
June 1, 2012 Filing 1465 RESPONSE to filed by Respondent David Stix by Schroeder Respondents' Response in Opposition to #1173 Amended Motion of Moving Parties to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case in 1944 Replies due by 6/11/2012. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 6/1/2012 to delete unnecessary parties, add Davix Stix and add link to #1173 . (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke); Affidavit of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke); [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke); Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (George Hucke); Affidavit of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (George Hucke); [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (George Hucke); Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (Jordan); Affidavit of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Jordan); and [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Jordan)(Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 add links to document. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1463 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1461 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Jordan) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 to remove unnecessary parties (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1462 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder re #1461 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Jordan) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 removed unnecessary parties from entry. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1461 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Jordan) by Laura A. Schroeder. Motion ripe 5/30/2012. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 remove unnecessary parties. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1460 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1458 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 to removed unnecessary parties. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1459 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder re #1458 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 remove unnecessary parties. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1458 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se (Richard A. & Pamela K. Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. Motion ripe 5/30/2012. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 to removed unnecessary parties. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1457 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1455 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (George Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 to removed unnecessary parties. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1456 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder re #1455 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (George Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 5/31/2012 to delete parties not involved. (WJ).
May 30, 2012 Filing 1455 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Pro Se (George Hucke) by Laura A. Schroeder. Motion ripe 5/30/2012. (Schroeder, Laura) Text Modified on 5/30/2012. (BLG).
March 19, 2012 Filing 1454 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("not deliverable as addressed") re #1444 Order, addressed to Lee Dorsey, Trustee. (DRM)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1453 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp") re #1444 Order, addressed to Philip D. Lambert. (DRM)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1452 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp") re #1444 Order, addressed to Cheryl Fogarty. (DRM)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1451 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp") re #1444 Order, addressed to Northern Nevada Bank. (DRM)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1450 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp") re #1444 Order, addressed to John E. Kirch. (DRM)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1449 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (" unable to forward ") re #1444 Order addressed to Ralph J. Menke. (DRM)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1448 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("moved left no address") re #1444 Order, addressed to Dave Hybarger. (KO)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1447 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to send") re #1444 Order, addressed to Catherine Uccelli-Adkins. (KO)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1446 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to send") re #1444 Order, addressed to Christopher F. Crawforth. (KO)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1445 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time expired") re #1444 Order, addressed to Farah Dorostkar. (KO)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 ORDER - Respondents' Motions for Discovery (# #1203 , #1204 , #1207 , #1401 , #1419 , #1420 ) are DENIED. FURTHER ORD the Moving Parties' Request for a Status Conference (#1442 ) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORD responses to the Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the 1944 Final Decree must be filed not later than Friday, June 1, 2012. Replies to the responses must be filed not later than Friday, June 29, 2012. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 2, 2012 Filing 1443 NOTICE by Petitioners Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, re #1442 MOTION for Hearing. CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 3/2/2012 removed all Respondents from entry. (WJ).
February 14, 2012 Filing 1442 STATUS REPORT Moving Parties' Request for Hearing on Supplemental Discovery Requests and for Status Conference (filed by TMWA/Gordon DePaoli) by Truckee Meadows Water Authority. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 2/14/2012 to correct filer (AF). Modified on 2/14/2012 to change to request for hearing. (WJ).
January 6, 2012 Filing 1441 LETTER from Erika G. Lynn requesting removal from email notification list. (DRM) Modified on 1/9/2012 to reflect Clerk cannot comply with this request - CM/ECF cannot terminate service of documents without terminating party from case entirely. (DRM).
January 6, 2012 Filing 1440 NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Respondents Nevada State Engineer, (Stockton, Bryan) Modified on 1/6/2012 to show the only filer is Nevada State Engineer. (WJ).
December 21, 2011 Filing 1439 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1424 , #1425 , #1426 , #1427 , #1428 Orders, addressed to Gilbert Cavillo. (DRM)
December 5, 2011 Filing 1438 NOTICE by Respondents Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe,re #1429 Response to #1419 Motion. CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 12/6/2011 to add link to motion. (WJ). Modified on 1/6/2012 to show that Pyramid Lake Paiute are the only filers for this document. (WJ).
December 1, 2011 Filing 1437 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Patricia H. Lindstrom, re #1424 , #1425 , #1426 , #1427 , #1428 Orders. (DRM)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1436 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to sender") re #1424 , #1425 , #1426 , #1427 , and #1428 , addressed to Thomas Yturbide. (KO)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1435 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to sender") re #1424 , #1425 , #1426 , #1427 , and #1428 , addressed to Paula Yturbide. (KO)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1434 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to sender") re #1424 , #1425 , #1426 , #1427 , #1428 Orders, addressed to Northern Nevada Bank @ PO Box 19570, Reno, NV 89511-2119. (KO)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1433 REPLY to #1429 Response to #1419 #1422 Motion for Discovery - RESPONSE to Moving Parties' Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Requests for Discovery filed by Defendant Michael S. Lowry.(MLC)
November 28, 2011 Filing 1432 REPLY to Response to #1419 MOTION for Discovery, #1401 MOTION ; filed by Truckee-Carson Irrigation District. (Van Zandt, Michael) Modified on 11/28/2011 to correct filer (AF).
November 28, 2011 Filing 1431 REPLY by Schroeder Respondents to Moving Parties' Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental #1419 Requests for Discovery, with Certificate of Service, filed by Respondents. (Schroeder, Laura) (Per call from counsel, modified on 11/28/2011, system not allowing filer to be selected properly (AF).) Modified on 11/29/2011 add link to motion. (WJ). (Per call from counsel, Main Document 1431 detached and reattached on 11/29/2011 to correct missing header on document. (AF))
November 18, 2011 Filing 1430 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1395 Minutes, addressed to Virginia Fowler. (DRM)
November 18, 2011 Filing 1429 RESPONSE to #1419 MOTION for Discovery, filed by Petitioner Truckee Meadows Water Authority. Moving Parties' Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Requests for Discovery Replies due by 11/28/2011. (De Paoli, Gordon)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 ORDER GRANTING #1403 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Pro Se. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case as to Steven Beyer. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 ORDER GRANTING #1409 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Pro Se. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case as to Bruna and Ray Mertens. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER GRANTING #1406 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Pro Se. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case as to Erin Ferretto. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER GRANTING #1415 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case as to Robert E. Brigham, III Trust, c/o Robert E. Brigham, III. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 ORDER GRANTING #1412 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case as to the Bremner Living Trust. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1423 JOINDER to #1420 Supplement ; Motion for Discovery filed by Defendant Villacorta Living Trust. (Crowley, Martin) Modified on 11/9/2011 add link to #1204 (WJ).
November 8, 2011 Filing 1422 JOINDER to #1419 Supplement ; filed by Defendant Villacorta Living Trust. (Crowley, Martin)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Schroeder Respondents' Supplement to Motion for Discovery (Docket #1204 ) Pursuant to Court Order (Docket #1395 ) by Respondent David Stix re #1420 Supplement. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 11/9/2011 add links to include #1204 (WJ).
November 8, 2011 Filing 1420 SUPPLEMENT to #1204 MOTION. Schroeder Respondents' Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ; by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1419 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SUPPLEMENT TCID's Supplemental Request for Discovery by Defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation District. (Van Zandt, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2011 correct title of entry. (WJ).
November 7, 2011 Filing 1418 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Respondent David Stix re #1414 Proposed Order Submission, #1415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Robert E. Brigham, III Trust by Laura A. Schroeder., #1417 Proposed Order Submission, #1408 Proposed Order Submission, #1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Erin Ferretto Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder., #1403 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Steven Beyer Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder., #1412 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Bremner Living Trust by Laura A. Schroeder., #1411 Proposed Order Submission, #1413 Affidavit, #1410 Affidavit, #1405 Proposed Order Submission, #1409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Bruna and Ray Mertens Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder., #1407 Affidavit, #1416 Affidavit, #1404 Affidavit. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1417 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Robert E. Brigham, III Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent Robert Brigham III Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1416 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Robert E. Brigham, III Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent Robert Brigham III Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Robert E. Brigham, III Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent Robert Brigham III Trust. Motion ripe 11/7/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1414 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1412 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Bremner Living Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Interested Party Bremner Living Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1413 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1412 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Bremner Living Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Interested Party Bremner Living Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1412 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Bremner Living Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. by Interested Party Bremner Living Trust. Motion ripe 11/7/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1411 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Bruna and Ray Mertens Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1410 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Bruna and Ray Mertens Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Bruna and Ray Mertens Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent David Stix. Motion ripe 11/7/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1408 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Erin Ferretto Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1407 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Erin Ferretto Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Erin Ferretto Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent David Stix. Motion ripe 11/7/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1405 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1403 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Steven Beyer Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1404 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1403 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Steven Beyer Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1403 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondent Steven Beyer Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent David Stix. Motion ripe 11/7/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1402 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura A Schroeder on behalf of Respondent David Stix. Notice of Interested Party Clements Ranching, LLC, c/o Holly D. Wolf, Manager (Schroeder, Laura)
November 7, 2011 Filing 1401 MOTION for Further Discovery - Supplemental Pleading for Further Discovery by Respondent Michael S. Lowry. Responses due by 11/24/2011. (MLC)
November 4, 2011 Filing 1400 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #1395 Motion Hearing,,,,, held on 10-24-11, before Judge Lloyd D. George. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 775-786-5584. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2012. (KF)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1399 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1395 Minutes addressed to Charlotte Barr, PO Box 218, Fernley, NV. (DRM)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1398 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1395 Minutes addressed to Judith Lamb, 1305 Mesa Dr., Fernley, NV. (DRM)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1397 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1395 Minutes, addressed to Earl Kessler, North Valley Holdings, PO Box 70458, Reno, NV. (DRM)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1396 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1395 Minutes addressed to Danny Lamb, 1305 Mesa Dr., Fernley NV 89408. (DRM)
October 25, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1395 Minutes of Proceedings : Corrected to reflect 10/24/2011 hearing date. (no image attached)(DRM)
October 25, 2011 Filing 1395 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2011 before Judge Lloyd D. George. Crtrm Administrator: Paris Rich; Court Reporter/FTR #: Denise Saavedra; Time of Hearing: 10:16 am; ( see pdf Order for specifics re attendees. ) ORDERED that the Court reserves ruling as to #1203 and #1204 Motions. FURTHER ORD the moving parties of #1203 and #1204 Motions are hereby granted 15 days from this date to file written Supplement(s) setting forth specific requests and requirements with respect to entitled discovery. Responses thereto due within 10 days, and replies 10 days thereafter. FURTHER ORD all Supplemental filings shall be served to the Court's Chambers in Las Vegas, Nevada. FURTHER ORD the issue regarding an evidentiary hearing will be address by the Court at a later date. IT IS ORDERED, with respect to the Court's earlier ruling this date, Mr. Lowery, in Pro Per, shall be allowed to file and serve a supplemental pleading within 15 days from this date for the Court's consideration. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/25/2011 to correct hearing date (DRM). Modified on 10/25/2011 to modify text to reflect 15 day filing ddls(PM).
September 27, 2011 Filing 1394 COPY OF ORDER #1394 FROM 3:73-CV-00003-LDG, FILED 9/27/2011 : ORDERED that the #1173 Amended Motion is treated as a Petition to Modify or Amend the Final Decree entered in this case, A-3-LDG, in 1944. FURTHER ORD that the Clerk of the Court shall create and administratively open a separate sub-file of A-3-LDG, which sub-file shall be assigned to the undersigned, and shall be given case number 3:73-cv-031-LDG, and which sub-file shall be solely for pleadings, submissions and papers related to the review of the Petition. FURTHER ORD that the Clerk of the Court shall remove the Petition to Modify or Amend the Final Decree (#1173 ) and related filings (documents # #1168 - #1172 , #1174 - #1178 , #1180 , #1184 , #1185 , #1186 , 1188 , #1193 - #1368 , #1380 , #1381 , and 1387 ) and place the documents in the newly created sub-file. FURTHER ORD that the parties shall include, in the caption of all further documents filed regarding this Petition, the following title: "Re: Petition to Modify or Amend Final Decree." The Court further orders that, upon creating and administratively opening a sub-file devoted to the Petition to Modify or Amend the Final Decree, the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate the #1173 Amended Motion in 3:73-cv-003-LDG.(DRM) Modified on 9/30/2011 to reflect docket number for this entry changed from #1388 to #1394 to maintain docket congruence between the two cases; no paper mailing performed (DRM).
September 19, 2011 Filing 1387 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Lloyd D. George, on 9/19/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Judy Harris. RE: #1204 MOTION. Schroeder Respondents' Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, RE: #1203 MOTION for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement IT IS ORDERED the Court sets this matter for Hearing on MONDAY, OCTOBER 24, 2011 at 10:00 AM in Reno, NV Courtroom to be determined before the Honorable Judge Lloyd D. George. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JJH)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1381 NOTICE by Petitioner Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1380 Status Report. CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE (Springmeyer, Don)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1380 Joint STATUS REPORT Moving Parties' Request for Hearing Or, in the Alternative, Status Conference by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1368 JOINDER to #1203 , #1204 MOTION(s)for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Respondent Ernest C. Schank (DRM)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER GRANTING #1361 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case obo Louis Gomes Family Trust. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/20/2011. ( Paper Copy has been distributed only to affected party - DRM) Modified on 5/25/2011 to denote limited paper service (DRM).
May 19, 2011 Filing 1366 REPLY to Response to #1207 MOTION for Hearing City of Fallon's, et al Joinder in Truckee Carson Irrigation District's Motion for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of ; filed by Defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C)(Van Zandt, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 1365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Schroeder Respondents by Respondent David Stix re #1361 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Louis Gomes Family Trust by Laura A. Schroeder., #1362 Affidavit, #1364 Reply to Response to Motion, #1363 Proposed Order Submission. (Schroeder, Laura)
May 19, 2011 Filing 1364 REPLY to Response to #1204 MOTION. Schroeder Respondents' Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura)
May 19, 2011 Filing 1363 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1361 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Louis Gomes Family Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent Louis Gomes Family Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
May 19, 2011 Filing 1362 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder re #1361 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Louis Gomes Family Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent Louis Gomes Family Trust. (Schroeder, Laura)
May 19, 2011 Filing 1361 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Louis Gomes Family Trust by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent Louis Gomes Family Trust. Motion ripe 5/19/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
May 18, 2011 Filing 1360 RESPONSE to #1204 MOTION and #1203 MOTION for Hearing filed by Respondent Jacqueline C. Lavoie. Replies due by 5/28/2011. (PM)
May 17, 2011 Filing 1359 RESPONSE to #1203 Motion for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement and #1204 Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery filed by Respondent Connie Armstrong. Replies due by 5/27/2011. (MLC)
May 17, 2011 Filing 1358 RESPONSE to #1203 Motion for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement and #1204 Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery filed by Respondents Anthony P. Dibnah and Cara C. Dibnah. Replies due by 5/27/2011. (MLC)
May 17, 2011 Filing 1357 RESPONSE to #1203 Motion for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement and #1204 Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery filed by Respondent Sharon Lee and Gordon Ronnow. Replies due by 5/27/2011. (MLC)
May 13, 2011 Filing 1356 RESPONSE to #1203 Motion for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement and #1173 Amended Motion of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case filed by Respondent Mary Francess Elliott. Replies due by 5/23/2011. (MLC)
May 11, 2011 Filing 1355 RESPONSE to #1204 MOTION and #1203 MOTION, filed by Respondent Duntley Family Revocable Trust (Ronald E. Duntley, Sr.). Replies due by 5/21/2011. (PM)
May 11, 2011 Filing 1354 RESPONSE to #1204 MOTION and #1203 MOTION filed by Respondents John H. Douglas, Julie Lingenfelter. Replies due by 5/21/2011. (PM)
May 11, 2011 Filing 1353 RESPONSE to #1204 and MOTION #1203 MOTION for Hearing, filed by Respondent Jerry J. McKnight. Replies due by 5/21/2011. (PM)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1352 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Doren Sorensen. Replies due by 5/20/2011. (KO)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1351 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Curtis L Dodson. Replies due by 5/20/2011. (KO)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1350 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Norman W. Frey. Replies due by 5/20/2011. (KO)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1349 NOTICE by Petitioner Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1322 Response to #1203 Motion,. CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 5/11/2011 add link to motion. (WJ).
May 9, 2011 Filing 1348 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Jacqueline C. Lavoie. Replies due by 5/19/2011. (KO)
May 9, 2011 Filing 1347 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Wilma J. Hybarger, Trustee Hybarger Living Trust. Replies due by 5/19/2011. (KO)
May 6, 2011 Filing 1346 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Kathryn D Gonzalez. Replies due by 5/16/2011. (DRM)
May 6, 2011 Filing 1345 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Virgil K. Johnson. Replies due by 5/16/2011. (DRM)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1344 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Ernest C. and Carmen Schank. Replies due by 5/15/2011. (KO)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1343 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Dana E Weishaupt. Replies due by 5/15/2011. (KO)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1342 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Karl and Bettie Weishaupt. Replies due by 5/15/2011. (KO)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1341 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Analisa Zimmerman, David Zimmerman. Replies due by 5/15/2011. (KO)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1340 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Linda Vincent. Replies due by 5/15/2011. (KO)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1339 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Newlands Water Protective Association (signed by Jamie Mills, Executive Director). Replies due by 5/15/2011. (Attachments: #1 Response Part 2, #2 Response Part 3, #3 Response Part 4)(PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1338 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Mary Francess Elliott. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1337 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Kathy Schultz. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (KO)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1336 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Dan Schultz. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1335 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Deborah Stapleton. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (KO)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1334 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Marjorie Ann Shepard. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1333 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Chad M. Larkin. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1332 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent James Sustacha. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1331 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents John R. Mincer, Kristen L. Mincer. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (KO)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1330 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Heidi Siegel. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1329 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Michael S. Lowry. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1328 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Sharlene Cosens. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1327 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Stuart J. Mackie. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (KO)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1326 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Roger Kunzler. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1325 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Susan Mackie. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1324 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Jean C. Lattin. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (PM)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1323 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Lynn W. Kinsell and (Husband) Floyd W. Rathbun. Replies due by 5/14/2011. (BLG) Modified on 5/4/2011 indicate QC assisted filing. (BLG).
May 4, 2011 Filing 1322 RESPONSE to #1203 MOTION for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement, filed by Petitioner Truckee Meadows Water Authority. Moving Parties' Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Motions for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Replies due by 5/14/2011. (De Paoli, Gordon)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1321 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by William R. (clerk unable to identify last name). Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1320 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Interested Party Valene S. Brady. (DRM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1319 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Carol D. French. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1318 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by McKnight. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1317 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Interested Parties Charles W. Hanks, Rosemary S. Hanks. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1316 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Patricia A. Stephens, Wilbur E. Stephens. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1315 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Teddy Chaffee. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1314 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Lynn Puccinelli. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1313 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Shannon Weaton (Clerk unsure of last name). Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1312 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Blake Goodsall. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1311 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Charmaine F. Christie. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1310 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Sunday Schwein. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1309 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Lawrence Mori. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1308 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Gary R. Detrick. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1307 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Judy Ashton. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1306 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent John Fraser. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1305 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Allan Hansen. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1304 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Shirley Fraser. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1303 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Gary Bacock, Helen Bacock. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1302 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent William H. Penaluma. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1301 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Alan Addison. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1300 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Stephen J. Cheek. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1299 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Shirley Fraser. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (PM)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1298 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Steven Griswold. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1297 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Jean M Workman. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1296 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by William J. Orsley. Replies due by 5/13/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1295 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by James Pagni. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1294 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Isabella Swartz. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1293 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Arlene McDowell. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1292 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by William M. Hall and (Unknown). Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1291 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by J. Byrd. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1290 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Kathleen L. Blanchard, Raymond L. Blanchard. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1289 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Stephen Smith. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1288 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Charles E. Miller. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1287 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Ray R. Deitz. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1286 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Stephen B. Crook, Susan Crook. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1285 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Rodney Windle and Ann Windle. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1284 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Dale Boyd. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1283 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Richard A. O'Connell. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1282 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Carla Bismark. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1281 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Drake Robles. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1280 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Maxwell R Brassfield. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1279 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Marcia L Ernst. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1278 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Alford J. Jeakins. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1277 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Thomas Streckfus. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1276 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Linda N. Jincks. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1275 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Hydro Tech Inc. (signature illegible). Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1274 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by D. Edwin Brush and Regina Kay Brush. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1273 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by W. Stiren. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1272 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Wayne E. Dennis and Mary Jo Dennis. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1271 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Georgia G. Gillespie. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1270 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Vivian G. Lyon. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1269 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Charley Dickerson. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1268 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Dan Dillard. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1267 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents John H. Douglas, Julie Lingenfelter. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1266 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondents Brad W. McClure, Valerie McClure. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (PM)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1265 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by (first name unknown) Johnson. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1264 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondents Roy Moody, Vicki Moody. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1263 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, by Walter Christie. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1262 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Max Hale. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1261 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Michael A. Tonis. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1260 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Interested Party Charles W. Hanks. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1259 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Lawrence H. Biral. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
May 2, 2011 Filing 1258 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Bob L. Stinnett. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1257 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by June Enhilder. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (PM)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1256 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by William McDowell. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1255 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Ben Fairless. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1254 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Robert Knoll. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1253 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Gail Laflame. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1252 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Robert Bannon. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1251 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Delwyn K. Schoening and Diana M. Schoening. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1250 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Balie Lyon. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1249 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by R.C. Short. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1248 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Phyllis Nance. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1247 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Charles Parks. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1246 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Constance V. Knoll. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1245 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Anthony G. Ilardi, W.C Cecil, Donna Blodgett, Dwight Orton, Ann Windle, Gar Johnston, Jim MacMechan, Lynda Freeman. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1244 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Respondent Kathleen Morser. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1243 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Robert & Naomie Flowers. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1242 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Bruce Laflame. Replies due by 5/9/2011. (KO)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1241 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case, filed by Clarence L. Shields. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (KO)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1240 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Elizabeth A. Brush Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1239 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Dwight L. Orton. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM) Modified on 4/28/2011 to clarify text(PM).
April 28, 2011 Filing 1238 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent John Edward Freeman (and Lynda Freeman). Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1237 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by KD Mitchell. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1236 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Wesley A. Brush. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1235 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent William T. Jones. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1234 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Cottonwood Farm & Livestock LLC. (submitted by William T. Hedges, Managing Partner) Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1233 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondents Gwynne Thomas, William R, Thomas. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1232 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Becky Humphrey. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1231 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Eugene L. Knuttila. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1230 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Roger D. Sorensen. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1229 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent David & Debra Young. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1228 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Anthony G. Ilardi. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1227 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Loya Bennett. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 28, 2011 Filing 1226 RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Respondent Arleen Johnson. Replies due by 5/8/2011. (PM)
April 27, 2011 Filing 1225 OBJECTION RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Case filed by Respondent David Ernst. (MLC) Modified on 4/28/2011 to note Response(PM).
April 26, 2011 Filing 1224 LETTER from Robert and Mary Oxley to Judge George expressing concern re up stream storage of irrigation water. RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Robert and Mary Oxley. (DRM) Modified on 4/28/2011 to clarify text and add link(PM).
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER GRANTING #1220 Letter. Richard S. Starkweather, Trustee, Starkweather Family Trust, may be removed from both the written and email notice lists for all further notices. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 19, 2011 Filing 1222 OBJECTION RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas ; filed by Respondent Patrice B. Marvel. (KO) Modified on 4/28/2011 to note Response(PM).
April 19, 2011 Filing 1221 OBJECTION RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas ; filed by Respondents Jerry J. McKnight, Tami L. McKnight. (KO) Modified on 4/28/2011 to note Response(PM).
April 19, 2011 Filing 1220 LETTER from Richard S. Starkweather, Trustee Starkweather Family Trust requesting removal of his name from both written and email notice lists. (DRM)
April 11, 2011 Filing 1219 OBJECTION RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas ; filed by Respondent Robert W. Soderburg. (KO) Modified on 4/28/2011 to note Response(PM).
April 11, 2011 Filing 1218 OBJECTION RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas ; filed by Respondent Robert L. Knox. (KO) Modified on 4/28/2011 to note Response(PM).
April 11, 2011 Filing 1217 LETTER to Judge George from Heidi Siegel opposing the Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Final Decree. RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, filed by Heidi Siegel. (DRM) Modified on 4/28/2011 to clarify text and add link(PM).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 ORDER GRANTING #1213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven H. Chestnut of Ziontz, Chestnut, Varnell, Berley & Slonim on behalf of Fallon-Paiute Shoshone Tribe is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 6, 2011 Filing 1215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1203 Joinder in TCID #1203 Motion for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement by Petitioner Churchill, County Of re #1206 Joinder,. (Mingay, Craig) Modified on 4/7/2011 add link to motion and joinder (WJ).
April 6, 2011 Filing 1214 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Steven H. Chestnut. ; filed by Interested Party Fallon Paiute-Shoshone Tribe. (Chestnut, Steven)
April 6, 2011 Filing 1213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Steven H. Chestnut. by Interested Party Fallon Paiute-Shoshone Tribe. Motion ripe 4/6/2011. (Chestnut, Steven)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER granting #1200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Laura A Schroeder withdrawn from the case for respondents Maurcio R. and Cecelia M. Cortes; said respondents continuing pro se. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 4/6/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Rs; status set to pro se; future service via USPS (DRM).
April 5, 2011 Filing 1211 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward" ) re #1198 Order, addressed to Pauline Lavoie. (DRM)
April 5, 2011 Filing 1210 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to send") re #1198 Order, addressed to Martin Ugalde, 570 La Rue Ave, Reno, NV 89509. (KO)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1209 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("forward time exp, rtn to send") re #1198 Order, addressed to David L. Doty @ 1016 Tumbleweed Court, Gardnerville, NV 89460-8929. (KO)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1208 ERRATA to #1205 Certificate of Service, ; filed by Respondent David Stix. (Schroeder, Laura) Modified on 4/5/2011 add links to motions #1204 and #1201 (WJ).
April 4, 2011 Filing 1207 MOTION for Hearing City of Fallon's, et al Joinder in Truckee Carson Irrigation District's Motion for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement re #1203 MOTION for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement by Respondents Darin & Misty Alegre, David C & Joanne M Barkley, Bear Creek Cabin, LLC, Samuel & Clare Behimer, Larry & Ricci Buchard, Levi C & Verna M Coleman, Carol Colip, Wayne Czichotzki, Duntley Family Revocable Trust, FH Ranch, LLC, Daniel R Fagundes, Fagundes Family Trust, Anita Fillmore, Gemini, Inc, Virgil M. Getto, Jeff & Karen Goings, Samuel & Danielle Guazzini, Laurel Hammond, Linda Hammond, Mark Hammond, T. Hammond, Thayne Hammond, Hammond & Hammond Rental Prop., Hendrix Ranch NV Partnership, Jesse Hernandez, Jaruayporn Hinkle, J. M. Gomes Ranch, Inc., Gary L & Kathrynh I Jamieson, Sonya S. Johnson, Johnson Family Trust, May L. Laca, Ronald Duane Lawrence, David G & Sylvia M Lumos, James P & Teresa M Mackedon, Michael F. Mackedon, Mackedon Family Trust, Matley Family Trust, John R.S. McCormick, Terrance & Catherine McGowan, Andrea McNair, Alice A. Minner, Minner Trust, Calvin R & Candace J Moffitt, Eric John & Dianna Olsen, Olsen 2007 Trust, Olsen Family Trust, Peraldo Bros., Alan J & Carey R Perazzo, Glen & Elizabeth Perazzo, Perazzo Family Trust, Perazzo LLC, Bernard Ponte, Bernard Ponte, Jr, Cynthia Elaine Ponte, Sage Creek Development Co., LLC, A & A Dairy, Ronald L & Maxine F Shane, Robert A & Nancy Soule, Ken Tedford, Jr, Week Family Trust, Gregory S. Whitaker, Linda A. Whitaker, Edna M & Ted Workman, Bonnie York, Petitioner Fallon, City Of. Motion ripe 4/4/2011. (Mackedon, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2011 correct title of document. (WJ).
April 4, 2011 Filing 1206 JOINDER to #1203 MOTION for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement ; filed by Petitioner Churchill, County Of. (Mingay, Craig)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Respondent David Stix re #1202 Proposed Order Submission, #1201 Affidavit, #1200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Mauricio R. and Celia M. Cortes Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder., #1204 MOTION. Schroeder Respondents' Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #1199 Notice of Appearance. (Schroeder, Laura)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1204 MOTION. Schroeder Respondents' Motion for Rule 26 Pre-hearing Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Respondent David Stix. Responses due by 4/21/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1203 MOTION for Hearing for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Proposed Modification or Amendment of the Orr Ditch Decree and the Proposed Operation of Truckee River Operating Agreement by Respondent Truckee-Carson Irrigation District. Motion ripe 4/4/2011. (Van Zandt, Michael)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1202 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Mauricio R. and Celia M. Cortes Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; filed by Respondent Mauricio R. and Celi Cortes. (Schroeder, Laura)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1201 AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of re #1200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Mauricio R. and Celia M. Cortes Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. ; by Respondent Mauricio R. and Celi Cortes. (Schroeder, Laura)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Respondents Mauricio R. and Celia M. Cortes Pro Se by Laura A. Schroeder. by Respondent Mauricio R. and Celia M. Cortes. Motion ripe 4/4/2011. (Schroeder, Laura)
April 4, 2011 Filing 1199 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura A Schroeder on behalf of Respondent Erin Ferretto. (Schroeder, Laura)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER RE: Proper Procedures of Notification and Distribution of Documents Filed (Participants Not Represented by Counsel and Participants Represented by Counsel) (See Order for specifics) See #1172 Order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER. THE COURT ORDERS that the original 907 Motion to Amend the Final Decree is denied as superseded by an amended motion. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1196 NOTICE RESPONSE to #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas, by Respondents Dennis Zubieta, Vicky Zubieta expressing concerns re possible loss of water, proposed changes, and economic repercussions therefrom. (DRM) Modified on 4/28/2011 to clarify text(PM).
March 15, 2011 Filing 1195 NOTICE by Respondents Dennis Zubieta, Vicky Zubieta requesting one notification at specified address for future mailings. (DRM)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1194 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("deceased") re #1172 Order on Stipulation, addressed to Edgar Siri. (KO)
February 24, 2011 Filing 1193 NOTICE by Interested Party Sentinel Real Estate Fund NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE (Leonard, Debbie)
February 10, 2011 Filing 1186 NOTICE of Change of Address by Respondent James D. Richardson. Old Addr: via USPS, 3265 Vickie Ln, Sparks, NV. 89431. New Addr: 1374 Granborough Dr., Gardnerville, NV. 89410-5001. (MLC) Modified on 2/11/2011 to reflect copy of Order #1172 mailed to respondent. (MLC).
February 10, 2011 Filing 1185 NOTICE by Petitioner Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe re #1180 Errata. CERTIFICATE OF MAIL SERVICE (Springmeyer, Don)
February 8, 2011 Filing 1184 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1172 Order, addressed to Colin Ryan Harlow. (DRM)
February 8, 2011 Filing 1180 ERRATA to #1177 Notice of Manual Filing, #1176 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) ; Moving Parties' Errata Notice filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1178 APPENDIX Receipt of Manual Filing of Appendix of Exhibits filed by Petitioner Truckee Meadows Water Authority. (De Paoli, Gordon) Modified on 2/4/2011 add link to motion #1173 (WJ).
February 1, 2011 Filing 1177 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff United States Of America re #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas. DVD 1 Appendix of Exhibits filed with the Clerk's Office. Moving Parties' Notice of Manual Filing of Appendix of Exhibits (Macfarlane, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1176 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States Of America re #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas. Notice of Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Decree and Summary of Moving Parties' Points and Authorities (Macfarlane, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1175 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas ; filed by Plaintiff United States Of America [Proposed] Order Modifying the Final Decree Entered in this Case in 1944. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1174 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States Of America re #1173 Amended MOTION of the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley to Modify or Amend the Final Decree Entered in this Cas. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 1173 PETITION to Modify or Amend the Final Decree; by the United States, State of Nevada, State of California, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Washoe County Water Conservation District, and City of Fernley. Responses due by 2/18/2011. (Macfarlane, Stephen). Modified on 9/30/2011 to designate original motion as a petition per Order #1394 (AF).
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER ON #1170 STIPULATION - 1. The Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Orr Ditch Decree and supporting evidence shall be filed and by 2/1/2011. 2. Any motions seeking discovery due by 4/4/2011. 3. Oppositions to any motions for discovery due by 5/4/2011. 4. Replies in support of any motions for discovery due by 5/19/2011. 5. No response to the Amended Motion to Modify or Amend the Orr Ditch Decree shall be filed and served except upon further order of the Court Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/31/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER GRANTING #1168 Motion for Leave to Manually File Appendix of Exhibits in CD Format. The Moving Parties shall, however, prepare and electronically file a Notice of Manual Filing of the Appendix of Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/31/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 28, 2011 Filing 1170 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order Concerning Schedule Related to Amended Motion to Modify or Amend Orr Ditch Decree by Petitioner Truckee Meadows Water Authority. (De Paoli, Gordon)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1169 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1168 Joint MOTION for Leave to Manually File Appendix of Exhibits in CD Format, and Points and Authorities Thereon ; filed by Plaintiff United States Of America. (Macfarlane, Stephen)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1168 Joint MOTION for Leave to Manually File Appendix of Exhibits in CD Format, and Points and Authorities Thereon by Plaintiff United States Of America. Responses due by 2/13/2011. (Macfarlane, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sub-file of A-3-LDG Re: Petition to Modify or Amend Final Decree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lake Ditch Company
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Linda J. Linton
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sharon Winder Avery
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ann Rosevear
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katharine G Hale
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nick Garro
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth E. Riedinger
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathan A Farley
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Earl D Dushane
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Fowler
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Stix
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Therese A Ure
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roger G. Hyytinen
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad M. Larkin
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darla McKenna
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas B. Clary
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maxwell R Brassfield
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phyllis M Miller
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah R. Knuttila
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne M. Vohl
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Represented By: Anne M Vohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Lynn Lakin
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charmaine F. Christie
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roger Kunzler
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathryn Hicks
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marijeanne Reno
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clifford Reynolds
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Hammond
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joyce Irene Betts
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Represented By: Martin G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steigerwald Living Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig S. Penner
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Meredith Hennessey
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John R Goodnight
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H T Cafferata
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hammond & Hammond Rental Prop.
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric John & Dianna Olsen
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Moore
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Milton H. Lees
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna J. Barton
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas A. Vallas
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael B. Bussio
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HWA D. Brodhead
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vicky Zubieta
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jesse Hernandez
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tahoe-Reno Industrial Center
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald C. Kirk
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ruth Ripsom
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elaine S. Sutherland
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harrah's Operating Co.
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Kathleen M Drakulich
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juarez Adams
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Emmil
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Condie
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carol McCracken
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roberta Shurtliff
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William A. Swager
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Perazzo LLC
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John T. Cimino
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Gomes Family Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Abacus Nevada LP
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Torvik
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Meyer Enterprise Inc
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bear Creek Cabin, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell E Miller
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth M. Willaman
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary J. Heser
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diana O. Parham
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Lavoie
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shirley S. Mayer
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shana Fearnley
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lee Dorsey, Trustee Dorsey Loving Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean M Workman
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Haisfield
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Dillard
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Tri Partners
Represented By: Brent T. Kolvet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aaron Farley
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: April M Edelstein
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Theron J. Hall
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Candee
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Mori
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara A. Hyytinen
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda K Rhodes Facque
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Serdehely
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garry Gadbois
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda A. Bowman
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Santor Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Peterson
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William H Wood, II
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hendrix Ranch NV Partnership
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garth Young
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith G. Schmidt
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jarold B. Sorensen
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Allegre
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George V Forbes
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry F Miller
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carmen Bell
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gladys T. Dieckmann
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charlie Knittle
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Red Hawk Land Company
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Harvey Whittemore
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cheryl Fogarty
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin R & Candace J Moffitt
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FH Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia A. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Bacock
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruce A Ericson
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Sustacha
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Biddinger
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirsten Kos
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis C. Davids
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G F Edgmon
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shyrle Myers
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John R. Mincer
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sam Hiibel
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vickie J. Martinson
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William G. Henry
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew M. Scholz
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katherine A. Ralston
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Juarez
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank B Monroe, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E.C. & Cynthia Kaufer
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Sparks
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Ross
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guy A Fowler
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Therese A Ure
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bonnie J. Rose
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shirley J. Siri
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paiute-Shoshone Tribe
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Mitchell C Wright
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandra T Goetze
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen E. Harmon
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory J. Chavez
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara J. Manha
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Morser
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold G & Rhonda L Johnson Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David G & Sylvia M Lumos
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel R Fagundes
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gloria J Fitch
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcia L Ernst
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gail Laflame
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Hesselgesser
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin T Siudzinski
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy R. Markley
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ferguson Family Trust
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Gilbert
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric D Grimes
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alois Krauer
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elliott Vincent
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janice Kirk
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary McCurry
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William T. Jones
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Orval F. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Therese A Ure
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wilbert J. Smith
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard M. Rose
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Reed
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph A. Manfredi
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert A. Gardner
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis E. Ingalls
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emilie A. Varella
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EBB LLC
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Baker
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Triny J. Otero
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Mansfield
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael A. Laca
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dale K Groves
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry & Ricci Buchard
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joyce Diegel
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawrence H. Biral
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunday Schwein
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eleni Papas
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rainer R. Schulz
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clarence C. Silva
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State Engineer
Represented By: Michael L Wolz
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Alf Brandt
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Represented By: James B. Cooney
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Stephen M. Macfarlane
Represented By: Fred R. Disheroon
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fallon, City Of
Represented By: Michael F. Mackedon
Represented By: Steven King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Distribution Only
Represented By: Allan L. Richards
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Represented By: Robert J. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?