FERNANDO PADRON RODRIGUEZ V. E.K. MCDANIEL, ET AL.
Case Number: 3:2002cv00236
Filed: April 25, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall transmit the Motion for Substitution of Respondent 82 to the Court of Appeals for its consideration. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 11/4/2011 to reflect that a copy of this Order was electronically sent to USCA. (MLC).
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT - The 54 amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILTIY. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 9/3/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDERED that the 54 Amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILTIY. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 9/2/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERNANDO PADRON RODRIGUEZ V. E.K. MCDANIEL, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?