Fabian Fuentez Rosas VS E.K. McDaniel, et al.,
Case Number: 3:2005cv00490
Filed: September 1, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and denying 78 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents shall file an answer to the second amended petition within 45 days. Petitioner shall file reply to answer within 45 days of being served with answer. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 68 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Response shall be filed on or before January 22, 2014. No further extensions shall be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED that # 63 Motion to reopen this action and motion for leave to file a second amended petition is GRANTED. FURTHER ORD that, as the stay is lifted by this order, the Clerk shall REOPEN THE FILE in this action. FURTHER ORD that the supple mental exhibits, 2013, at ECF Nos. 64 & 65 , are ACCEPTED as supplemental exhibits to the # 32 First amended petition. The Clerk of Court SHALL ATTACH AND/OR LINK the exhibits at ECF No. 64 & 65 to the # 32 First amended petition on the CM /ECF docket in this action. ( Clerk has added/clarified links to docket entries ## 64 , 65 Exhibits, referring back to #32 First amended petition; and, modified docket entry # 32 to establish link to the supplemental Exhibits. ) FURTHER O RD that petitioner shall have until 8/5/2013 to FILE AND SERVE a second amended petition and any further exhibits. FURTHER ORD that respondents shall have 30 days following service of the second amended petition to FILE AND SERVE an answer or oth er response to the same. FURTHER ORD that petitioner shall have 30 days following service. of the answer to FILE AND SERVE a reply brief. If a dispositive motion is filed in response to the second amended petition, the parties shall brief the moti on in accordance with Local Rule 7-2. FURTHER ORD that the parties SHALL SEND courtesy paper copies of any further exhibits filed in this action to the Reno staff attorney. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabian Fuentez Rosas VS E.K. McDaniel, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?