Kerzner International Limited et al v. Monarch Casino & Resort, Inc. et al
Case Number: |
3:2006cv00232 |
Filed: |
April 24, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward C. Reed |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1121 Trademark Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
483
ORDER re 214 Defendants' Verified Memorandum of Costs. The court awards sanctions to Defendants and against Plaintiffs in the total sum of $20,465.25 which constitutes the costs attributable to the work of Sharon Armstrong ($19,568.75) and Sara Whitehead ($887.50). Plaintiffs shall pay these sanctions within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 3/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
476
JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: (1.) In favor of Defendants with respect to all of Plaintiff's claims; (2.) In favor of Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants with respect to the First, Second, Third Counterclaims; (3.) In favor of Defendants/Counterclaimants with respect to the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Countercliams.(4.) With respect to the attorney's fees, each side shall bear its own attorney's fees. We do not find that t his is an exceptional case warranting attorney's fees under 28 U.S.C. § 1117, and decline to exercise any other authority to award attorney's fees. (5.) With respect to the award of costs, the Court finds that Defendants/Count erclaimants are the prevailing parties. Defendants/Counterclaimants shall file a bill of costs within ten (10) days after the date of entry of this order. Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants may file any objections within ten (10) days after being served with the bill of costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 2/10/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
464
MINUTE ORDER re 459 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Golden Road Motor Inn, Inc., Monarch Casino & Resort, Inc. ( Submission of Proposed form of judgment due by 10/29/2010.) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 10/07/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
458
ORDER GRANTING 457 Joint Request for Clarification : The joint pretrial order, which is required to be filed on September 13, 2010, should address only the first trial phase with regard to the issue of fame. The failure at this time to address issues, which may be considered in the second trial phase, will not waive any such issues for the second trial phase. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 9/8/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing
429
ORDER granting in part and denying in part (see order for specifics) 278 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 280 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 316 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 322 Motion for Summary Judgment.; granting in part and denying in part (see order for specifics) 325 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.; granting 340 Motion in Limine.; denying 345 Motion.; denying as moot 364 Motion in Limine.; denying as moot 376 Motion to Strike.; denying as moot 395 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/14/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?