Chernetsky v. State Of Nevada et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00252
Filed: May 5, 2006
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2016 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 236 ) is DENIED. The Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 237 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 9, 2015 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 176 Motion to Extend Time (Notice of Appeal due within 14 days); and denying 177 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 7, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 154 Report and Recommendation, granting in part and denying part 123 and 127 Motions for Summary Judgment, granting 155 and 158 Motions to Extend Time, and denying as m oot 156 Motion to Continue Trial. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Please see attached for details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 17, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and accepting 140 Report and Recommendation and denying 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 19, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING # 121 Motion to Strike : The Clerk shall STRIKE and RETURN Plaintiff's # 120 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 28, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 107 Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 12, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, Plaintiff's Motion to Set Trial Date 64 is DENIED. Defendants shall file an answer to the complaint on or before 6/26/2012. If defendants wish to participate in mediation, defendants shall file a Notice of Intent to Proceed With Medication by 6/26/2012. (See Order for specifics).IT IS SO ORDERED.Defendants Answer due 6/26/2012.(Notice of Compliance is due by 6/26/2012. Responses due by 6/26/2012.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
July 6, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that P's # 55 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and # 56 Request for Temporary Restraining Order are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chernetsky v. State Of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?