Geraldine Lee v. Northern Nevada Adult Mental Health Services. et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv00433
Filed: August 4, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 JUDGMENT City Auto Towing's Cross-Claim is DISMISSED. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 09/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER dismissed re 79 Crossclaim filed by City Auto Towing, Case terminated. Clerk shall enter jdgmt. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/22/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING D Sparks Police Department's 119 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/21/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 110 plaintiff's objections to orders denying motions and denying 111 plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. All dispositive motions shall be filed within 30 days of entry of this order. See order re specifics. ( Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/12/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 99 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 3/30/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geraldine Lee v. Northern Nevada Adult Mental Health Services. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?