USA ex rel. DENNIS MONTGOMERY v. WARREN TREPP, et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Dennis Montgomery
Defendant: Ascentia Capital Partners, LLC, General Ronald Bath, James Gibbons, Patty Gray, Paul Haraldsen, Warren Trepp, Sloan Venables, Michael West and eTreppid Technologies
Trustee: Jason M Rund
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2006cv00691
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2010 Filing 28 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Defendants. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 3/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
March 16, 2010 Filing 27 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/16/2010 before Judge Philip M. Pro. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Andrews; Pla Counsel: Peter Garrell; Def Counsel: Kathleen Goldberg, George Vitelli; Court Reporter/FTR #: Summer Rivera; Time of Hearing: 10:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 7C; The Court hears the representations of counsel as to the status of the case. On the agreement of the parties, IT IS ORDERED the case is dismissed without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMA)
March 5, 2010 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 3/5/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Andrews. IT IS ORDERED a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/16/2010 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. Counsel shall contact the Court's clerk at 702-464-5426 no later than Friday, March 12, 2010, for instructions on how to attend this hearing by phone.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMA)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/5/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas H. Casey for Jason M Rund and approving O'Reilly Law Group, LLC as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/29/09. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 28, 2009 Filing 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas H. Casey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Timothy R. O'Reilly (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001420909). Motion ripe 10/28/2009. (O'Reilly, Timothy)
September 25, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Ellyn S. Garofalo to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 11/9/2009.(no image attached) (WJ)
July 14, 2009 NOTE: Order 20 , Notice 19 , Complaint 2 served via LotusNotes e-mail to George Vitelli, Greg Addington, Ronald Logar, and Ellyn Garofalo. (no image attached) (LG)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Complt 2 unsealed; P/Relator Montgomery shall have to 11/13/09 to serve complt; remainder of file shall remain sealed except this Order 20 and the govt's notice 19 which P/Relator will serve at time of service of the complt; seal lifted as to all other matters occurring after this date; parties shall serve all docs on government; govt may order transcripts and is entitled to intervene at any time; all orders shall be sent to govt; should P/Relator or defts propose that action be dismissed, settled or otherwise discontinue, the court will provide govt with notice and opportunity to be heard prior to ruling. See attached order for all specifics. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 07/13/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
July 13, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by United States of America. (LG) Modified on 7/14/2009 (LG) Unsealed per Order 20 .
December 14, 2006 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Dennis Montgomery. Proof of service due by 11/13/2009 per Ord 20 . (LG) Modified on 7/14/2009 (LG) Unsealed per Ord 20 .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA ex rel. DENNIS MONTGOMERY v. WARREN TREPP, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascentia Capital Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Ronald Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Haraldsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Trepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sloan Venables
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eTreppid Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Montgomery
Represented By: Ellyn S. Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jason M Rund
Represented By: Thomas H Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?