Hussein v. ERSEK et al
Plaintiff: Hussein S. Hussein
Defendant: ADEL ERSEK, RAMONA LASLO, Hyungchul Han, David Thawley, Ron Pardini and Esmail Zanjani
Case Number: 3:2007cv00056
Filed: February 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDERED P Hussein's request to post his proposed reply (Doc. #904 in 3:04-cv-00455-JCM-GWF) to Ds' response (Doc. # 222 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC) to P's emergency motion for recusal of district judge (Doc. # 218 in 3:07-cv-00056-LR H-VPC) be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court file Hussein's reply (Doc. #904-2 in 3:04-cv-00455-JCM-GWF) to Ds' response (Doc. # 222 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC) to P's emergency motion for recusal of district judge (Doc. # 218 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/27/2010. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/27/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDERED that Ds # 144 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 98 objection to the Magistrate Judge's order is DENIED. FURTH ORD that the Magistrate Judge's 96 order addressing various discovery disputes is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDERED that P's 178 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's 170 Order denying P's motion for sanctions is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/7/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying 122 Motion for Order to Show Cause why Sierra Biomedical Research Corporation should not be held in contemopt; and denying 146 plaintiff's emergency motion for contempt and enforcement of subpoena duces tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 71 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. See order re specifics. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. ERSEK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein S. Hussein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADEL ERSEK
Represented By: Charles Hilsabeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMONA LASLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyungchul Han
Represented By: Charles Hilsabeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thawley
Represented By: Charles Hilsabeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Pardini
Represented By: Charles Hilsabeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmail Zanjani
Represented By: Charles Hilsabeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?