Hussein v. ERSEK et al
Plaintiff: |
Hussein S. Hussein |
Defendant: |
ADEL ERSEK, RAMONA LASLO, Hyungchul Han, David Thawley, Ron Pardini and Esmail Zanjani |
Case Number: |
3:2007cv00056 |
Filed: |
February 3, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
County: |
Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
223
ORDERED P Hussein's request to post his proposed reply (Doc. #904 in 3:04-cv-00455-JCM-GWF) to Ds' response (Doc. # 222 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC) to P's emergency motion for recusal of district judge (Doc. # 218 in 3:07-cv-00056-LR H-VPC) be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court file Hussein's reply (Doc. #904-2 in 3:04-cv-00455-JCM-GWF) to Ds' response (Doc. # 222 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC) to P's emergency motion for recusal of district judge (Doc. # 218 in 3:07-cv-00056-LRH-VPC). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/27/2010. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/27/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
211
ORDERED that Ds # 144 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing
204
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 98 objection to the Magistrate Judge's order is DENIED. FURTH ORD that the Magistrate Judge's 96 order addressing various discovery disputes is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
199
ORDERED that P's 178 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's 170 Order denying P's motion for sanctions is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/7/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
170
ORDER denying 122 Motion for Order to Show Cause why Sierra Biomedical Research Corporation should not be held in contemopt; and denying 146 plaintiff's emergency motion for contempt and enforcement of subpoena duces tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing
124
ORDER denying 71 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. See order re specifics. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?