Streczyn v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Marion Streczyn
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund and Menu Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00159
Filed: April 2, 2007
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2007 38
NOTICE from Defendant Sunshine Mills INC's of Opposition and Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (LK)
July 23, 2007 37
Re: MDL Case Transfer & Assignment - Letter from Clerk, USDC., Newark, N.J addressed to Clerk, USDC, Madison, WI - MDL Case has been assigned # 1:07-cv2867(NLH)(AMD) (DRM)
July 20, 2007 36
BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION from Jeffery N.Luthi, Clerk of the Panel,, addressed to William T. Walsh, clerk for the District of New Jersey, dated July 16, 2007, filed at MDL July 16, 2007 - - no oppposition having been received the conditional transfer order (CTO-1) is directed to be filed. (DRM)
July 16, 2007 35
NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) (DRM)
June 21, 2007 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 27 Verified Petition for Permission for Michael P. Turiello to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Charles W. Spann. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/12/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JW )
June 13, 2007 30
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 28 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Priya K. Jesani, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 581181) by Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Spann, Charles)
June 4, 2007 29
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Edward B. Ruff, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 581185) by Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund. (Spann, Charles)
May 29, 2007 26
Copy of Response to Mtn for Transfer to District of NJ submitted in MDL 1850. (JW )
May 22, 2007 25
Copy of NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument. (JW )
May 14, 2007 24
Copy of NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument submitted in MDL 1850. (JW )
May 10, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON STIPULATION re 16 Stipulation Granting 7 D's Mtn to Stay all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/9/07. (JW )
May 8, 2007 16
STIPULATION re 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, 8 Exhibit,,,, ; by Plaintiff Marion Streczyn. (O'Mara, Brian)
May 7, 2007 17
Copy of NOTICE of Appearance as to attorney Daniel L. Rottinghaus submitted in the MDL case 1850. (JW )
May 4, 2007 18
NOTICE - Other: BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION: MDL DOCKET 1850: Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Central District of California and for Cosolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 12 USC 1407. (DRM, )
May 3, 2007 11
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Marion Streczyn, Defendant Menu Foods, Inc.. Menu Foods, Inc. served on 4/20/2007, answer due 5/10/2007. (O'Mara, Brian)
April 30, 2007 12
NOTICE other - Letter from Bruce Newman of Newman Creed & Assoc of Bristol, CT, addressed to clerk of MDL Panel re corrections to Panel Attorney Service List attached. (DRM, )
April 19, 2007 7
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund. (Spann, Charles)
April 12, 2007 5
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Marion Streczyn. (O'Mara, Brian) Modified on 4/16/2007 (WJ) (no interested parties)
April 3, 2007 3
SUMMONS Issued as to Menu Foods Income Fund. (DRM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streczyn v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Charles W Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Streczyn
Represented By: Brian O O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?