Nasby v. McDaniel et al
Petitioner: Brendon Nasby
Respondent: E. K. McDaniel and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2007cv00304
Filed: July 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: White Pine
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting ECF No. 203 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 176 Amended Petition. Reply due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 194 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Respondents have until September 2, 2020, to respond to Nasby's Amended Petition (ECF No. 176 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDERED Respondents' unopposed first Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 191 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Respondents have until August 7, 2020, to respond to Nasby's Amended Petition (ECF No. 176 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDERED: 1. Respondents' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 182 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 2. Ground 2(D) of Petitioner Brendan Nasby's Amended Petition (ECF No. 176 at 3034) is STRICKEN as time- barred an d unexhausted. 3. Respondents must FILE AN ANSWER to the Amended Petition within 45 days of this order. (7/31/2020) 4. Nasby must FILE A REPLY in support of the Amended Petition within 45 days of service of Respondents' answer. 5. Further extensions of time are not likely to be granted absent compelling circumstances and a strong showing of good cause why the briefing could not be completed within the extended time allowed despite the exercise of due diligence. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 187 Respondents' third Motion for Enlargement of Time. The deadline for Respondents to file a second amended answer is VACATED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 181 Motion to Extend Time : Second amended answer to the amended petition (ECF No. 176 ) due by 12/5/2019. Amended reply due 30 days from service of second amended answer. Further extensions of time are not l ikely to be granted absent compelling circumstances and a strong showing of good cause whey the briefing could not be completed within the extended time allowed despite the exercise of due diligence. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting ECF No. 178 Motion for Enlargement of Time re ECF No. 176 Amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Second Amended Answer due by 10/21/2019. Petitioner will have 30 days from service of the second amendedanswer to file an amended reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting ECF No. 174 Motion to Extend Time : Amended Petition due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER giving Petitioner 45 days to file an amended petition. Second amended answer due within 45 days thereafter. Amended reply due within 30 days of answer. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Enlargement of Time, giving Petitioner until 4/24/2019 to file a reply to Respondents' opposition to Ppetitioner's request for leave to amend the petition. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER that Petitioner file a Reply to ECF No. 165 Response. Reply due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that respondents shall file a response to petitioner's request to amend the petition by 3/13/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting ECF No. 130 Motion to Extend Time : Respondents shall have until December 18, 2018, to supplement the state court record in compliance with the Court's order of October 17, 2018 (ECF No. 129 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that respondents file a supplement to the state court record including all available documents that were previously omitted, including but not limited to the documents discussed in order. Supplement due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that the Clerk SHALL REOPEN this action; Respondents SHALL FILE THE ENTIRE STATE COURT RECORD and SHALL FILE AN ANSWER to the petition within 45 days; Petitioner SHALL FILE A REPLY to the answer within 45 days after being served with the answer; the parties shall submit only one set of exhibits to avoid duplicity on the docket; all exhibits filed by the parties shall be filed with a separate index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number or letter; a hard copy (courtesy copy) of all exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to the staff attorneys in Reno, Nevada. (See Order for further details and instructions). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDERED that petitioner's motion for relief from judgment (ECF No. 100 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for an extension of prison copywork limit (ECF No. 101 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED a certificate of appealability regarding this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying Petitioner's 87 and 92 motions; directing Clerk to send a copy of this order to the USCA Ninth Circuit (NEF sent 6/15/2015). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying the remaining grounds of the federal petition for a writ of habeas corpus; denying a certificate of appealability; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 75 Motion : The clerk is directed to detach and file the Supplemental Exhibits attached to 75 Motion. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's motion for extension of time 68 is GRANTED. The reply brief shall be due sixty (60) days after entry of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel 69 is DENIED. (Deadline set in Habeas Corpus case for 8/17/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012.) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 6/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion to Reopen Case. FURTHER ORD Clerk shall REOPEN THIS FILE. FURTHER ORD Rs' answer/response to surviving grounds due by 6/4/2012. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 Motion to the extent that the Order was refiled on May 13, 2011,at ECF No. 55 , as directed by the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, pending remand from the Circuit Court, theMotion for Reconsideration 51 is GRANTED. The Order denying the motion for stay and abeyance 42 is hereby vacated and the Judgment 43 RECALLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that gro und 2(b) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS PROCEDURALLY BARRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claim. Petitioner may move to reopen the matter following exhaustion of grounds 5, 6 and 7of the peti tion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner filing a state post-conviction petition or other appropriate proceeding in state court within forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order and returning to fede ral court with a motion to reopen within forty-five (45) days of issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall transmit a copy of this Orderto the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in the case number assigned to petitioners appeal (Ack'd emailed to USCA). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pending remand from the Circuit Court, the Motion for Reconsideration 51 is GRANTED. The Order denying the motion for stay and abeyance 42 is hereby vacated and the Judgment 43 RECALLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ground 2(b) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS PROCEDURALLY BARR ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claim. Petitioner may move to reopen the matter following exhaustion of grounds5, 6 and 7 of the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner filing a state post-conviction petition or other appropriate proceeding in state court within forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order and returning to federal court with a motion to reopen within forty-five (45) days of issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 10 petition is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/18/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 41 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is DENIED. The petition is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. No certificate of appealability shall issue. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED that Rs' # 33 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court finds that grounds 1, 2(A), and 4 are procedurally defaulted and are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORD that grounds 2(B), 5, 6, and 7 are unexhausted. FURTHER ORD that P shall inform court by 9/18/2010 re exhaustion, dimisssal or stay and abeyance. FURTHER ORD that if P elects to abandon his unexhausted grounds, Rs shall have 30 days from the date P serves his declaration of abandonment in which t o file an answer to P's remaining grounds for relief. P shall thereafter have 20 days following service of Rs' answer in which to file a reply. FURTHER ORD that if P fails to respond to this order within the time permitted, this case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 8/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasby v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brendon Nasby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?