Sonntag v. Balaam et al
Plaintiff: Jason Eric Sonntag
Defendant: Judge Steinheimer, Deputy Obus, Secretary of Judge Steinheimer, Dennis Balaam, Deputy Barns and Deputy Sheldon
Case Number: 3:2007cv00311
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 126 , 127 , 128 , 131 , and 133 are DENIED. FURTH ORD that the 134 Motion to Stay is DENIED. FURTH ORD that the 136 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP on Appeal is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/31/2011. (NEF sent to USCA)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that defendants' 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation 123 is REJECTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING P's # 115 Motion to Vacate, and therefore the Court # 110 Order is sustained. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Court's 95 Order is AFFIRMED and the Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, the court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS in whole the 71 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. FURTHER ORDERED, Plaintiff's 72 Opposition to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Motio n to Strike and Vacate Biased, Conflicted Report is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as follows: (1) Counts I and II of the 42 Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice and Count III with leave to amend. FURTHER ORDERED, Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint stating only Count III in a manner identical to the previously filed 14 Complaint within thirty (30) days from entry of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 64 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [64 ] Counts 1 and 2 of the Second Amended Complaint 42 with prejudice and Count 3 with leave to amend. Plaintiff should be instructed to file a Third Amended Complaint stating only Count 3 in a manner identical to the previously filed complaint 14 within thirty (30) days from the date the Order is entered. Objections to R&R due 8/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/3/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Accepting and Adopting 55 Report and Recommendation: ORDERED D Steinheimers 24 Motion is Dismiss is GRANTED. ORDERED Washoe County Ds 33 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Count I with prejudice and Count II without prejudice and DENIED as to Count III; Ds Spitzer, Gammick, and the Washoe County Board of Supervisors are DISMISSED from the complaint with prejudice. FURTHER ORD P may amend his complaint within 30 days from entry of this Order restating Count II. ORDERED that Washoe Co unty Ds 38 Motion to Dismiss Ps Complaint for Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. ORDERED Ps 42 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Brian E. Sandoval on 1/22/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonntag v. Balaam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Obus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Judge Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Balaam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Barns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Eric Sonntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?