Sells v. McDaniel et al
Plaintiff: |
William C. Jr. Sells |
Defendant: |
E. K. McDaniel, Adam Endel, Howard Skolnik and Greg Cox |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv00170 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Washoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian E. Sandoval |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
150
JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Ds' 123 Motion for Involuntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) is GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
86
ORDER. The Court has reviewed the 84 Report and Recommendations and ACCEPTS it. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Counts I and III through XVI should be DISMIS SED; the federal claims against Defendants in their official capacities for money damages in Count II should be DISMISSED; and, the motion for summary judgment on Count II of the complaint should be DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing
84
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 46 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an Order GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 46 as follows: Counts I and III through XVI should be dismissed; the federal claims against Defendants in their official capacities for money damages in Count II should be dismissed; and the motion for summary judgment on Count II of the complaint should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/6/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 64 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Brian E. Sandoval on 07/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing
64
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William C. Jr. Sells. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an Order GRANTING Plaintiff's 39 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties should be aware that specific written objections to this R&R are to be filed within ten (10) days of receipt. Furthermore, this R&R is not an appealable order, and that any notice of appeal pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P., should not be filed until entry of the District Court's judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 4/9/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?